Nguyen v. Uttecht
Petitioner: Hung Van Nguyen
Respondent: Jeffrey Uttecht
Case Number: 2:2016cv01711
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Presiding Judge: James P. Donohue
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Hon. James P. Donohue granting petitioner an additional two weeks to file an optional reply brief to respondent's Answer 70 71 . Petitioner's optional reply brief due 5/19/2017; Petitioner's habeas petition is RE-NOTED for 5/19/2017. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Hung Nguyen, Prisoner ID: 748016)(PM)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER overruling petitioner's 68 Objection to Judge Donohue's order by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Hung Nguyen, Prisoner ID: 748016)(RS)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER directing respondent to submit, by 4/28/2017, copies of the transcript of petitioner's trial and of the trial court's instructions to the jury. Petitioner's federal habeas corpus is RE-NOTED for 4/28/2017. The Court STRIKES respo ndent's 30 Answer to the habeas petition. Respondent shall re-submit the Answer by 4/28/2017, with a more thorough and less conclusory analysis with respect to each of petitioner's habeas claims. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Hung Nguyen, Prisoner ID: 748016)(PM)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER overruling Nguyen's 56 Objection by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Hung Nguyen, Prisoner ID: 748016)(RS)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER overruling Nguyen's 43 Objections by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Hung Nguyen, Prisoner ID: 748016)(RS) cc JPD
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying Petitioner's 49 Motion to Certify Questions to the Washington States Supreme Court, by Hon. James P. Donohue. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Hung Nguyen, Prisoner ID: 748016)(PM) cc: copy of order emailed to the Washington State Attorney General
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hung Van Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?