LifeGoals Corp v. Advance Hair Restoration LLC
Plaintiff: LifeGoals Corp
Defendant: Advance Hair Restoration LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01733
Filed: November 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice re parties' 50 Stipulation, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting in part and denying in part AHR's 34 Motion to Compel Discovery. The court ORDERS LifeGoals and Mr. Davis to provide the previously withheld documents under the NDA. The court further ORDERS Lifegoals, Mr. Davis, and their co unsel to pay the reasonable expenses incurred by AHR in bringing the present motion. The court will enter an additional order establishing the specific amount of those reasonable expenses following further submissions from the parties as delineated above. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Extension of Time; RENOTING Defendant Advance Hair Restoration LLC's 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment , and Defendant Advance Hair Restoration LLC's 34 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Documents : Noting Date 11/29/2017, signed by Judge James L. Robart.(SWT)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Stipulated Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 26 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LifeGoals Corp v. Advance Hair Restoration LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LifeGoals Corp
Represented By: Mark Edward Kearney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kevin T Steinacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Hair Restoration LLC
Represented By: Jay C. Free
Represented By: Benjamin I VandenBerghe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?