Ali v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Marian Sharif Ali
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2016cv01734
Filed: November 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:423
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting parties' 27 Stipulated Motion for attorney fees and costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiff to account for discrepancy re parties' 27 Agreed Motion for Order for EAJA Fees and Expenses, and Plaintiff's 25 Motion for EAJA Fees. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; this matter is reversed and remanded for further administrative proceedings by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RS)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE-NOTING Defendant's 20 MOTION to Remand ; Noting Date 9/5/2017, Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (TH)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 5/11/2017, by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Sharif Ali
Represented By: Harvey S. Grad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?