Paradise Construction, LLC v. Signature Flight Support Corporation
Plaintiff: Paradise Construction, LLC
Defendant: Signature Flight Support Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv01810
Filed: November 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing Plaintiffs' claims against defendant Signature Flight Support Corporation with prejudice and without costs to either party. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 44 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting Defendant's 38 Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosure signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting parties' 33 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Case Schedule. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/19/2017, Motions due by 2/20/2018, Discovery completed by 3/20/2018, Dispositive motions due by 4/20/2018, 39 .1 mediation to be completed by 6/1/2018, Motions in Limine due by 6/20/2018, Pretrial Order due by 7/6/2018, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 7/13/2018, Jury Trial is set for 7/23/2018 before Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Leave to File Counterclaim re parties' 28 Stipulated Motion ; the Court grants leave to Defendant Signature Flight Support Corporation to file an amended answer (including a counterclaim) within ten (10) days of the date of this order, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING IMPROPER NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) cc Jacob and Hillman mailed copy at Paramount Law Group address
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Defendant leave to file and serve its Amended Answer; re Parties' 16 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (swt)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 Parties' Stipulation for Extension to Submit Initial Disclosures. Deadline to submit Initial Disclosure is extended to 3/10/2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (swt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paradise Construction, LLC v. Signature Flight Support Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paradise Construction, LLC
Represented By: Brent L Nourse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Flight Support Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?