Vopnford v. WellCare Health Plans et al
Plaintiff: Linda Vopnford
Defendant: WellCare Health Plans, Comprehensive Health Management Inc, Tom Potts, Frank Webster, Lydia Ophaug, Ray McComb, Kaleista Lagarde, Tom Cahill and Does 1-150
Case Number: 2:2016cv01835
Filed: November 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice an d without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 86 Motion for Leave to File Her Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 84 One Hour Late. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 76 Motion to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER striking Plaintiff's 68 Motion to Compel Discovery without prejudice to refiling the motion in a manner that comports with the court's scheduling order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting Defendant's 55 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 62 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 59 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order without prejudice to re-filing in a manner that comports with the court's local rules. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 56 Motion to Extend Expert Cut-Off. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/30/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 49 Motion for Leave to Amend and authorizes her to file the corrected third amended complaint in the form attached as Exhibit A (Dkt. # 51 , Ex. A) within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. The court further DISMISSES Moving Defendants' 47 Partial Motion to Dismiss as moot. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(TH)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER on Motion for Default (Dkt. # 34 ). Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default having been granted in part and denied in part in the court's order of 8/25/17 (Dkt. # 43 ), and it appearing that Defendant Tom Cahill has failed to plead or otherwise defend in this action, the default of Mr. Cahill is hereby entered. (AD)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Defendant WellCare Health Plans's 39 Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Judge James L. Robart. The court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Moving Defendants' motion to strike and partially dismiss (Dkt. # 20 ); STRIKES paragraphs 3.2 through 3.31 from the amended complaint; DISMISSES without prejud ice Ms. Vopnford's claims against Mr. Potts, Ms. Ophaug, Mr. McComb, and Ms. Lagarde for lack of personal jurisdiction; DISMISSES with prejudice Ms. Vopnford's Title VII, ADEA, EPA, and ADA claims against Mr. Webster; and DISMISSES with lea ve to amend Ms. Vopnford's negligent hiring and supervision claim against Mr. Webster and CHMI, Ms. Vopnford's intentional infliction of emotional distress claim against Mr. Webster and CHMI, and Ms. Vopnford's ADA claim against CHMI. The court DISMISSES without prejudice Ms. Vopnford's claims against the Doe defendants and ORDERS Ms. Vopnford to show cause no later than August 15, 2017, why the court should not dismiss her claims against Wellcare and Mr. Cahill for failure to serve. (PM)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Extension of Noting Date on Defendants' Partial Dismissal Motion 20 . Defendants' Partial Dismissal Motion 20 is renoted for 6/30/2017; Plaintiff's response due 6/19/2017; Reply due 6/30/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting defendants' 16 Motion for Extension of Time to 5/18/17 to Answer by Judge James L. Robart.(RS)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing plaintiff to show cause within 10 days by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vopnford v. WellCare Health Plans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Vopnford
Represented By: Edward S Alexander
Represented By: Lawrence A Hildes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WellCare Health Plans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comprehensive Health Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydia Ophaug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray McComb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaleista Lagarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-150
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?