J. R. Simplot Company v. Washington Potato Company et al
Plaintiff: J. R. Simplot Company
Defendant: Washington Potato Company, Oregon Potato Company, Frank Tiegs and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 2:2016cv01851
Filed: December 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT directing the Clerk of the Court to enter a judgment in this case. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 111 Motion to Strike "Confidentiality" Designations Re Simplot Deposition Testimony; denying Defendants' request for attorneys' fees; striking as moot Defendants' 113 Motion to Seal. Clerk directed to keep the deposition transcript 114 sealed. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting defendants' 49 Motion to Dismiss; striking 57 Motion to Disqualify; striking 73 Motion to Compel; striking 75 Motion for TRO; striking 76 Motion for Discovery; striking 98 Motion to Amend ; striking 21 Motion to Appoint as moot by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER construing plaintiff's 75 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction as a motion for preliminary injunction only; this motion shall be renoted for 4/14/2017, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting Plaintiff J. R. Simplot Companys 61 Motion for Leave to File Over-Length LCR 37(a)(2) Joint Motion. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (swt)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER directing parties to file briefing no later than 3/20/17 at 12pm re 57 MOTION to Disqualify filed by National Frozen Food Corporation by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J. R. Simplot Company v. Washington Potato Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. R. Simplot Company
Represented By: Kimberly M. Bousquet(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Diana S Breaux
Represented By: Ryan Gehbauer(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Robert H. Lang(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Renato Mariotti(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Patrick Morales-Doyle(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Elise N. Puma(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jeremy E Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Potato Company
Represented By: Jaime Drozd Allen
Represented By: Bradley Lloyd Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Potato Company
Represented By: Jaime Drozd Allen
Represented By: Bradley Lloyd Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Tiegs
Represented By: Jaime Drozd Allen
Represented By: Bradley Lloyd Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?