Kouame v. DAL Global Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Koffi Kouame
Defendant: DAL Global Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01857
Filed: December 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting Defendant DAL Global Services, LLC's 26 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing parties to file statements re: discovery dispute by 10/4/2017 at 4:00 p.m. signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart directing parties to file statements regarding discovery dispute by 8/18/2017, at 4:00 p.m. Telephone Conference set for 8/29/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER The court declines to set the deadline for disclosure of the parties' damages experts 30 days after the court's order on any motion for summary judgment by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kouame v. DAL Global Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koffi Kouame
Represented By: Richard John Wotipka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAL Global Services, LLC
Represented By: Leah C Lively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?