Torres v. City of Seattle et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Torres
Defendant: City of Seattle and Several Unknown Police Officers
Case Number: 2:2016cv01863
Filed: December 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties 13 Stipulation to Dismiss Without Prejudice. The Sixth Cause of Action of Plaintiff's 10 Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice from this action. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly on 3/23/2017. (swt)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court will treat plaintiff's filing of the amended complaint 10 as a motion for leave to amend and will grant such motion. Plaintiff's amended complaint will be deemed filed and served as of the date of this Minute Order. City of Seattle's partial motion to dismiss, docket no. 7 , is STRICKEN without prejudice. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. City of Seattle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Several Unknown Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Torres
Represented By: James Bible
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?