Northwest Environmental Advocates v. U.S. Department of Commerce et al
Plaintiff: Northwest Environmental Advocates
Defendant: U.S. Department of Commerce, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 2:2016cv01866
Filed: December 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' 193 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for an Award of Costs and Attorneys' Fees. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to renote Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees (Dkt. No. 177 ) for consideration on July 20, 2021. Defendants must file any responses to Plaintiff's motion no later than July 6, 2021. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' 191 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Fees and Costs. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to renote Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees (Dkt. No. 177 ) for consideration on 5/20/2021. Defendants must file any responses to Plaintiff's motion no later than 5/6/2021. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' 189 Stipulated Motion. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to re-note Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees (Dkt. No. 177 ) for consideration on April 29, 2021. Defendants must file any responses to Plaintiff's motion no later than April 15, 2021. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(SR)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' 186 Stipulated Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule of Plaintiff's 177 MOTION for Attorney Fees: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to renote Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees (Dkt. No. 177 ) for consideration on April 22, 2021. Defendants must file any responses to Plaintiff's motion no later than April 8, 2021. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(MW)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL re parties' 174 Motion Entry of Stipulated Order of Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(PM)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 172 stipulated motion to extend the stay. The Court hereby GRANTS the motion and EXTENDS the stay until December 15, 2020. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PM)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' 170 Stipulated Motion to Extend Stay. The Court hereby EXTENDS the stay for 90 days from the date of entry of this order. The parties must file a motion to govern on or before the expiration of the stay. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(LH)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 168 Stipulated Motion to Stay. The Court hereby EXTENDS the stay for 60 days from the date of entry of this order. The moving parties must file a motion to govern on or before the expiration of the stay. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 164 Stipulated Motion to Extend the Stay. The Court EXTENDS the stay for 60 days from the date of entry of this order. The moving parties must file a motion to govern on or before the expiration of the stay. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 162 Stipulated Motion to Extend the Stay. The stay is EXTENDED for 60 days from the date of entry of this order. The parties are DIRECTED to file a motion to govern on or before the expiration of the stay. In addition, Plaintiff, the Federal Defendants, and the State of Washington are DIRECTED to (1) share all written settlement communications with the Washington State Farm Bureau and Washington Cattlemen's Association and to (2) invite the Washington State Farm Bureau and Washington Cattlemens Association to all substantive oral settlement communications. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 160 Joint Motion to Stay. The stay is EXTENDED until 11/25/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to file a motion to govern on or before 11/25/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 155 Stipulated Motion to Extend Stay. The Stay is EXTENDED until 8/24/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SWT)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 152 Stipulated Motion to Vacate Current Case Management Schedule and Stay Case to Explore Settlement. The current case management schedule (Dkt. Nos. 146 , 151 ) is VACATED. The case is STAYED until 6/25/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to file a motion to govern on or before 6/25/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 150 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery shall be completed by 5/10/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 145 Stipulated Motion to lift the stay and set a new case management schedule. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 3/19/2019, Discovery completed by 4/26/2019, Dispositive motions due by 6/21/2019, Pretrial Order due by 11/27/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 12/4/2019. The stay in this case is LIFTED. The trial date is EXTENDED to 12/9/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 143 Stipulated Motion to Stay All Proceedings. The scheduling order is STAYED until appropriations have been restored to Defendants. The parties shall file a joint motion proposing a new scheduling order within seven days of Congress restoring appropriations to Defendants. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 129 Motion for Leave to Take Discovery. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 133 Stipulation to Extend Dates for Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery. Defendants and Defendant-Intervenor must respond to Plaintiff's motion (Dkt. No. 129 ) by November 30, 2018. Plaintiff's reply is due no later than December 7, 2018. The motion (Dkt. No. 129 ) is RENOTED to December 7, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 134 Stipulated Motion Requesting Amendment of the Court's Schedule. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/21/2018, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 2/1/2019, Disc overy completed by 3/11/2019, Dispositive motions due by 4/12/2019, Pretrial Order due by 7/31/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 8/7/2019, Bench Trial is extended to 8/12/2019 at 9:30 AM. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 120 Motion for extension of discovery deadlines, pretrial deadlines, and the trial date. Bench Trial is continued to 6/3/2019 at 09:30 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour, Expert Witness Disclos ure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/14/2018, Discovery completed by 2/3/2019, Dispositive motions due by 3/5/2019, Proposed pretrial order due by 5/22/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 5/29/2019. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 113 Motion for Reconsideration signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's 113 MOTION for Reconsideration re 112 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court DIRECTS Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's motion by Monday, August 13, 2018. Should Plaintiff wish to file a reply, it must do so by Monday, August 20, 2018. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-note the motion for reconsideration (Dkt. No. 113 ) to Monday August 20, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ( 93 -1) as to Claims #2 and #3 and Defendants' cross-motion for partial summary judgment as to Claims #2 and #3 (Dkt. No. 108 ) is GRANTED. The claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 102 Stipulated Motion to Amend the Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 2 and 3. On or before May 11, 2018, Defendants and Defendant-Intervenor shall each file a res ponse/cross-motion for partial summary judgment. On or before May 25, 2018, Plaintiff shall file a combined reply brief in support of its motion for partial summary judgment and response to any cross-motion for partial summary judgment. On or before June 8, 2018, Defendants and Defendant-Intervenor shall file any reply briefs in support of any cross-motions for partial summary judgment. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-note Plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. No. 91 ) to June 8, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 98 Stipulated Motion for Agricultural Interests to File an Amici Curiae Brief on Remedy. Consistent with their stipulation, WFB and WCA are DIRECTED to withdraw their pending motion for a partial stay pending appeal of the Court's order denying them intervenor status. (See Dkt. Nos. 84 , 95 .) Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER re parties' 85 Joint Stipulated MOTION to Establish Briefing Schedule. On or before 3/16/2018, Defendants shall file additional administrative record materials related to Plaintiff's Second Amended Supplementa l Complaint. On or before 3/30/2018, Plaintiff shall file a motion for partial summary judgment on claims two and three. On or before 5/4/2018, Defendants and Defendant-Intervenor shall each file a response/cross-motion for partial summary judgment, on claims two and three. On or before 5/18/2018, Plaintiff shall file a combined reply brief in support of its motion for partial summary judgment and response to any cross-motion for partial summary judgment on claims two and three. On or before 6/1/2018, Defendants and Defendant-Intervenor shall file any reply briefs in support of any cross-motions for partial summary judgment on claims two and three. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 85 Joint Stipulated MOTION to Establish Briefing Schedule. Additional administrative record materials related to Plaintiff's Second Amended Supplemental Complaint due by 3/16/2018. Motion for partial summ ary judgment on claims two and three due by 3/30/2018. Response/Cross-Motion for partial summary judgment on claims two and three due by 5/4/2018. A combined reply brief in support of its motion for partial summary judgment and response to any cross-motion for partial summary judgment on claims two and three due by 5/18/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying Proposed Intervenors' 67 Motion to Intervene signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (Washington Cattlemen's Association and Washington State Farm Bureau Federation terminated)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting Washington State's 66 Motion to Intervene. The Court DIRECTS Intervenor to file its proposed answer within ten (10) days. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 71 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint. Plaintiff may file the complaint attached to the motion as Exhibit 1 within ten (10) days of this order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 69 Unoppossed Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the motion to intervene. Defendants' response is due February 5, 2018 and Intervenors' reply, if any, is due February 9, 2018. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-note the motion (Dkt. No. 67 ) to February 9, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 64 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; Amended Pleadings due by 1/19/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 1/19/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 59 Stipulated Motion to Extend Date for United States to File the Second Part of the Administrative Record. Defendants are to file the second part of the administrative record no later than 11/29/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 44 Motion to Determine Scope of Review of Claim Six signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying Defendant's 42 Motion for Reconsideration authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 51 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Determine the Scope of Review for Claim Six. Plaintiff's reply brief will be due November 3, 2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING Defendants' 42 MOTION for Reconsideration re 39 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Claims 4 and 5 ; Noting Date 10/28/2017, authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 40 Unopposed Motion to Extend Date for the United States' Answer, Administrative Records, and Potential Motion for Reconsideration. Any motion for reconsideration due 10/6/2017; Answer to First Amended Complaint due 10/24/2017; first part of administrative record due 10/24/2017; second part of administrative record due 11/22/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 33 Motion to extend date for United States' reply in support of its motion to dismiss. Reply due 8/25/2017. Clerk directed to renote Defendants' 21 Motion to dismiss to 8/25/2017. Authorized signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 23 Stipulated Motion; RENOTING defendants' 21 MOTION to Dismiss, Noting Date 8/15/2017; Status Conference RESCHEDULED to 10/31/2017 at 09:00 AM. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting 19 stipulated motion to set a briefing schedule and for leave to file over-length briefs. Defendants' motion to dismiss due by 4/7/2017; Response due 6/9/2017; Reply due 7/10/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Environmental Advocates v. U.S. Department of Commerce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Environmental Advocates
Represented By: Paul August Kampmeier
Represented By: Allison LaPlante(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?