Waddell v. Cash & Carry Stores LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Waddell and Estate of Nathan Waddell
Defendant: Cash & Carry Stores LLC, Smart & Final LLC, XYZ Company/Corporations and John/Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2016cv01937
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having advised the Court that this matter has been resolved, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs. In the event settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen and trial will be scheduled, provided such motion is filed within 60 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER Setting oral argument on Defendant Cash & Carry Stores LLC's 52 MOTION to Strike Opinions of Gary Schuster, M.D. for 7/27/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Counsel for defendants are DIRECTED to deliver to chambers by noon on Friday, June 29, 2018, a copy of the entire Schuster Expert Report and a copy of the complete deposition of Gary Schuster, MD. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER setting oral argument on Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Custom Cooler, Inc.'s 41 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment for Friday, July 27, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Parties are ordered to engage in mediation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 39.1(c) prior to July 27, 2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 32 Stipulated Motion for Extension; deadline for disclosure of expert testimony CONTINUED to 4/20/2018, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 19 Stipulated Motion as follows: Jury Trial (5-8 days) is set for 9/10/2018 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/20/2018, Motions due by 4/12/201 8, Discovery completed by 5/21/2018, Dispositive motions due by 5/31/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 2/20/2018, Motions in Limine due by 8/2/2018, Pretrial Order due by 8/17/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 8/17/2018, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 8/17/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 7 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall electronically file her amended complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waddell v. Cash & Carry Stores LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash & Carry Stores LLC
Represented By: A. Troy Hunter
Represented By: Justin Patrick Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart & Final LLC
Represented By: A. Troy Hunter
Represented By: Justin Patrick Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Company/Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Waddell
Represented By: Paul B Apple
Represented By: Steven D Weier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Nathan Waddell
Represented By: Paul B Apple
Represented By: Steven D Weier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?