Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. The Cheesecake Factory Inc et al
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: The Cheesecake Factory, Inc and The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv01942
Filed: December 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James P. Donohue
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CONSET DECREE AND ORDER. The Court HEREBY ORDERS THAT the Consent Decree be approved as the final decree of this Court in full settlement of this action. This lawsuit is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorneys fees. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re parties' 50 Stipulated Motion to Seal Medical Information and Records; directing Clerk to maintain seal on dkts 54 , 55 , and 56 ; directing Clerk to remove the seal from dkt. 57 , signed by Judge James L. Robart.(SWT)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Relief from the Deadline in the Court's September 6, 2017 Order (Dkt. No. 39 ). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 22 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part EEOC's 24 Motion to Quash Defendants' third-party subpoenas. The court DENIES Defendants' request for attor ney's fees. The EEOC shall complete its responses to Defendants' requests for production, interrogatories, and requests for admission in accord with the court's rulings herein within 10 days of the filing of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding EEOC's First Amended Complaint re parties' 35 Stipulation, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER striking Defendants' 19 Motion to compel without prejudice to refiling the motion in a manner that comports with the court's scheduling order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 17 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. The Cheesecake Factory Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Damien Anthony Lee
Represented By: Roberta Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cheesecake Factory, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?