Long v. Live Nation Worldwide, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barry Long
Defendant: Live Nation Worldwide, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01961
Filed: December 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Jury Trial is set for 6/10/2019; Length of Trial: 4-5 days. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/19/2018, Motions due by 1/10/2019, Discovery completed by 2/18/2019, Dispositive motions due by 3/21/2019, Motions in Limine due by 5/9/2019, Pretrial Order due by 5/24/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2019 at 01:30 PM . Trial briefs/Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 5/24/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying defendants' 38 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; Joint Status Report due within fourteen days of this Order, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER striking oral argument scheduled for 2/15/2018 at 10:00 a.m.; If, after further consideration of the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment, the Court believes that oral argument will be beneficial, the hearing will be reset. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER to SET oral argument on Plaintiff's 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment, and Defendants' 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Thomas S Zilly; STRIKING trial date of 3/12/2018 and all related dates and deadlines. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting Elizabeth Reeve and Reeve Shima's 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Added attorney Elizabeth K Reeve for Ticketmaster LLC.)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying defendant's 27 Motion to Dismiss, Stay or Compel Arbitration, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' 22 Motion for relief pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d) /Response to Motion ; RENOTING plaintiff's 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Noting Date 12/8/2017, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 13 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall electronically file his amended complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Live Nation Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Long
Represented By: Christopher Robert Carney
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?