Cox v. United States of America
Petitioner: Douglas Michael Cox
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2016cv01980
Filed: December 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting petitioner's 15 Motion for voluntary dismissal of motion to vacate 2255 motion by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The deadline for the Government to file and serve an Answer to Petitioner's Motion Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to Vacate, Correct, or Set Aside Sentence is extended until March 10, 2017. (KERR)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Government's answer to Petitioner's motion is extended to 3/3/17. Petitioner's reply, if any, shall be filed within thirty (30) days after the Government's answer is due. (KERR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas Michael Cox
Represented By: Michael Filipovic
Represented By: Alan Zarky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Nicholas William Brown(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?