United States of America v. Estate of Clarence Jess Groesbeck et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Estate of Clarence Jess Groesbeck, Silvia Groesbeck, Skagit County Treasurer, C. Jess Groesbeck, M.D., A.P.C., Groesbeck Family Trust and Genesis Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01985
Filed: December 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Skagit
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 53 Unopposed MOTION for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Lien Priority between the United States and Deutsche Bank pursuant to parties' 45 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER to Consolidate re parties' 33 Stipulated MOTION to Consolidate Cases . The following cases shall be consolidated for all purposes, including trial: Case No. 2:16-cv-1985-RAJ, and No. 2:17-cv-01013-RAJ. All further docume nts in the consolidated action shall be filed in the Case No. 2:16-cv-01985-RAJ and bear this cause number. As previously ordered, no later than MAY 7, 2018, the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report with a new proposed trial date that is agreeable to all parties. Authorized by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting Deutsche Bank National Trust Company's 26 Motion to Intervene signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.'s 25 Motion to Intervene signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting United States' 22 Unopposed Motion for Order to Appear or Plead by Day Certain; Leave to Serve by Publication; and Extension of Time to Serve. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(TH)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REGARDING LIEN PRIORITY by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Estate of Clarence Jess Groesbeck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Charles J Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Clarence Jess Groesbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvia Groesbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skagit County Treasurer
Represented By: Arne O Denny
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Jess Groesbeck, M.D., A.P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groesbeck Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?