Sampson v. Knight Transportation, Inc
Plaintiff: Valerie Sampson
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv00028
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTE ORDER re Parties' 120 Joint Proposed Case Management Schedule: Jury Trial is set for 10/18/2021 at 09:30 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Class list due date 8/24/2020, Mailing of class notice is due by 9/8/2 020, Opt-out deadline is due by 11/9/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/12/2021, Discovery completed by 6/20/2021, Dispositive motions due by 7/18/2021, Proposed pretrial order due by 10/4/2021, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 10/14/2021. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (LH)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting parties' 118 Joint request for approval of the proposed class notice plan. The parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer to develop a proposed case management schedule. If the parties cannot agree on a case management schedule , Plaintiffs shall file a proposed case management schedule, to which Defendants may respond. The proposed case management schedule is due by August 17, 2020. If the parties cannot agree, Defendants' response is due by August 19, 2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 52 Motion to Certify Class signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting 110 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. The Clerk is directed to RENOTE the motion for class certification (Dkt. No. 52 ) for May 4, 2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 106 Joint Status Report. The Court LIFTS its stay of this action. Defendants may submit a supplemental brief addressing the Washington Supreme Court decision and any new relevant legal authority issued after the cl ose of the class certification briefing due on 3/18/2020. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' is due on 3/25/2020. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification (Dkt. No. 52 ) is RENOTED for 3/25/2020. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER re parties' 100 Joint MOTION Regarding Designation of Party who will Submit the Opening Brief on the Question Certified to the Washington Supreme Court re 92 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs shall file its opening brief with the Washington Supreme Court in accordance with the Washington Rules of Appellate Procedure. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying Defendants' 71 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. All proceedings in this case, to include Plaintiffs' undecided motion for class certification (Dkt. No. 52 ), are hereby STAYED pending the Washington State Supreme Cour t's resolution of the certified question. A stay of proceedings is appropriate to avoid piecemeal litigation and to conserve the resources of the Court and the parties. The parties are DIRECTED to file a joint status report every 180 days. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 50 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines for Class Certification Briefing. Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification is due by 3/30/2018; Defendant's Response is due by 4/27/2018; and Plaintiff's Reply is due by 5/18/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 43 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadlines for Class Certification Briefing. Plaintiff's opening brief is due February 2, 2018. Defendant's response brief is due March 2, 2018. Plaintiff's reply brief is due March 23, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint for Damages. Plaintiff shall file her amended class action complaint within 14 days of this order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 31 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadlines for Class Certification Briefing. Plaintiff's opening brief is due December 8, 2017. Defendant's response brief is due January 19, 2018. Plaintiff's reply brief is due February 16, 2018. Noting Date 2/16/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 14 Motion to certify a question to the Washington Supreme Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER This matter comes before the Court on the parties' stipulated motion to extend the deadlines for class certification briefing 13 . The Court, finding good cause, GRANTS the motion. Plaintiff's opening brief is due August 25, 2017. Defendant's response is due September 29, 2017. Plaintiff's reply is due October 23, 2017 by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RS)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER setting class certification briefing deadlines. Plaintiff's Opening Brief due 7/21/2017; Defendant's Response due 8/25/2017; Plaintiff's Reply due 9/8/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sampson v. Knight Transportation, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Sampson
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Erika L. Nusser
Represented By: Hardeep S Rekhi
Represented By: Greg Alan Wolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey B DeGroot
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?