Hooper et al v. City Of Seattle, Washington et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Hooper, Brandie Osborne, The Episcopal Diocese of Olympia and Real Change
Defendant: City of Seattle, Washington, Washington State Department of Transportation and Roger Millar
Case Number: 2:2017cv00077
Filed: January 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER denying Defendant City of Seattle's 230 Motion for Conversion of Preliminary Injunction Ruling into Final Judgment on the Merits; granting Plaintiffs' 234 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims and the City of Seattle's Counterclaim. Plaintiffs' claims and the City of Seattle's counterclaim are DISMISSED without prejudice. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 210 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. Plaintiffs must promptly notify the Court if their Rule 23(f) petition is granted or denied. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting 214 Stipulated Motion for Ten-Day Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay. Defendants' responses to Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay due 11/9/2017; Reply due 11/17/2017. Plaintiffs' 210 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal is re-noted for 11/17/2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 2 Motion for Class Certification; denying Plaintiffs' 93 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER denying Defendant City of Seattle's 204 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authorities and Citations, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SWT)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting Defendants' 196 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Materials in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MINUTE ORDER directing WSDOT to re-file the video contained in Exhibit 1 of Mr Huot's Declaration by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER denying National Law Center on Homelessness and Poverty's 145 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 127 Motion for entry of order regarding production of documents by Google, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting parties' 84 Joint Stipulated Motion to File Second Amended Complaint ; withdrawing as moot Plaintiffs' 81 Motion to Amend Complaint, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SWT)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 79 Stipulation, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 23 Motion for TRO by Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Plaintiff's concurrent motion for Preliminary Injunction will be scheduled for oral argument. No later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, the parties shall meet and confer and submit to the Court by way of Joint Status Report a proposed briefing schedule for any supplemental briefing to be submitted by the parties and several proposed oral argument dates and times, along with a proposed Order. (SSM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooper et al v. City Of Seattle, Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Hooper
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Represented By: Eric A Lindberg
Represented By: Blake Edward Marks-Dias
Represented By: Breanne Mary Schuster
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Talner
Represented By: Todd T Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandie Osborne
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Represented By: Eric A Lindberg
Represented By: Blake Edward Marks-Dias
Represented By: Breanne Mary Schuster
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Talner
Represented By: Todd T Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Episcopal Diocese of Olympia
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Represented By: Eric A Lindberg
Represented By: Blake Edward Marks-Dias
Represented By: Breanne Mary Schuster
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Talner
Represented By: Todd T Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Real Change
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Represented By: Eric A Lindberg
Represented By: Blake Edward Marks-Dias
Represented By: Breanne Mary Schuster
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Talner
Represented By: Todd T Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle, Washington
Represented By: Patrick Downs
Represented By: Taki V. Flevaris
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Myerberg
Represented By: Gregory Colin Narver
Represented By: Matthew J Segal
Represented By: Carlton Wm Seu
Represented By: Gary T Smith
Represented By: Gregory J Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Transportation
Represented By: Matthew D. Huot
Represented By: Alicia O Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Millar
Represented By: Matthew D. Huot
Represented By: Alicia O Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?