Hill v. Value Inn 22246
Plaintiff: Anthony D Hill
Defendant: Value Inn 22246
Case Number: 2:2017cv00087
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. Mr. Hill's deadline to file a second amended complaint passed on April 12, 2017, and he has filed nothing further in this matter. Accordingly, the court dismisses this case with prejudice. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via the USPS
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER dismissing 24 Amended Complaint; denying Plaintiff's pending motions 20 , 21 , 22 and 25 ; striking as improperly filed 19 Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to file a second amended complaint no later than 4/12/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (swt) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel and granting Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Extension of Time to file an amended complaint. Amended complaint due within 14 days of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(PM) cc: plaintiff via the USPS
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart denying 5 Motion for Order to Occupy; denying 6 Motion for Order to Allow; denying 7 Motion for Order for Search Warrant; denying 8 Motion to Amend Cover Sheet; granting 9 Motion to Amend Complaint; and denying 10 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. The Court DISMISSES Mr. Hill's Complaint and GRANTS Mr. Hill leave to amend his Complaint within twenty (20) days of the dateof this Order. Amended Complaint due by 2/23/2017.(SSM)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Hon. James P. Donohue granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via the U.S. Mail
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Value Inn 22246
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony D Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Inn 22246
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?