Wagafe et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Abdiqafar Wagafe and Mehdi Ostadhassan
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, John Kelly, Lori Scialabba, Matthew D Emrich, Daniel M Renaud and Donald Trump
Case Number: 2:2017cv00094
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 593 MOTION for Reconsideration, granting Parties' 568 Stipulated MOTION for Order Allowing Redacted Filings on Summary Judgment Briefing . The parties shall file the redacted Filings within 21 days of this Order. The stay shall otherwise remain in effect until 6/9/2022. Signed by Judge Lauren King.(MW)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER re 591 Stipulated MOTION for extension of time to respond to court order Dkt. No. 587. In light of the parties' stipulated stay and the terms set forth above, the Court STRIKES the 3/29/2022 joint statement deadline. The Cour t will set a new joint statement deadline, if necessary, once the parties submit their updated Joint Status Report on or before 7/8/2022. Whether and to what extent the parties may file redacted summary judgment briefs turns on the Court's re solution of their "joint statement concisely consolidating their positions on any materials for sealing." Dkt. No. 587 at 6. The Court accordingly GRANTS the parties' stipulation as modified and DENIES as moot the parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Court Order. Signed by Judge Lauren King.(MW)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER granting Amici's 555 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. The amicus brief attached as Exhibit 1 to the Motion for Leave is hereby deemed filed. Signed by Judge Lauren King.(MW)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER STRIKING PARTIES' MOTIONS TO SEAL: The Court STRIKES the parties' motions to seal and motions for leave to file "highly sensitive documents." See Dkt. Nos. 459 , 464 , 465 , 474 , 479 , 484 , 489 , 496 , 501 , [5 05], 513 , 514 , 543 , 544 , 562 , 564 , 578 . The Court FURTHER ORDERS the parties to meet and confer and file a joint statement concisely consolidating their positions on any materials for sealing within 60 days, or by 3/29/2022. The parties shall also submit to the Court a joint digital copy of the proposed materials for sealing on a flash drive. Signed by Judge Lauren King.(MW)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER granting Defendants' 454 Motion for Reconsideration and 455 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 424 Motion to Compel Statistical Data. The Court also GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to seal the motion to compel statistical data, Dkt. # 423 , Plaintiffs' motion to seal its reply in support of the motion to compel statistical data, Dkt. # 437 , and Defendants motion to seal its exhibits, Dkt. # 432 . Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER re Parties' 434 Stipulation for Order Setting Page Limits for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Matters: Each side shall be allocated a maximum of 90 pages for briefing their respective motions for summary judgment. The de adlines for dispositive motions and summary judgment briefing set out in Dkt. # 413 , page 3, are not suspended, but the Court may consider reasonable adjustments based on a joint proposal submitted by the parties no later than 11/6/2020. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Overlength Brief, Dkt. # 421 , is deemed withdrawn. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER granting 374 Motion to Seal; granting 375 Sealed Motion to redact 5/28/2020 hearing transcript. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER granting Defendants' 414 Motion for Leave to Take Additional Depositions. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief, Dkt. # 421 , and Defendants' request to file an opposition to Plaintiffs' motion, Dkt. # 422 . Dkt. Given the extraordinary nature of Plaintiffs' request, the Court hereby GRANTS Defendants' motion to file an opposition and ORDERS Defendants to file their response within 7 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 397 Motion to Exclude. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' motion to exclude untimely disclosed witnesses and GRANTS Plaintiffs' request to conduct four additional depositions. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (LH)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER granting 399 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Stipulation for Order to Modify Protective Order Thereon, filed by Plaintiffs Hanin Omar Bengezi, Mushtaq Abed Jihad, Sajeel Manzoor, Mehdi Ostadhassan, Abdiqafar Wagafe. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. On 7/22/2020, this Court held a telephone conference with the parties to discuss outstanding discovery disputes detailed in the parties' supplemental briefings. Dkt. ## 378 (Plaintiffs 9; supplemental briefing), 383 (Defendants' responsive briefing). Having considered the parties' briefs and oral arguments, the Court ORDERS as follows: The center of dispute between the parties is the scope of what should be pro duced from the five A-Files, and the Defendants have represented there may be thousands of pages of documents contained within the files. The Court is amenable to an in-camera review of the A-Files, and the parties are directed to meet and confer to narrow the scope of the A-File review. Based upon the parties' submission, the Court will make a final determination of whether it will take a random selection of the A-Files or review the entirety of what the parties have recommended. Th e parties have agreed to provide the narrowed scope of documents to the Court by 8/5/2020. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's request to subpoena third agencies as untimely. The deadlines set by the Court have passed and it will not revisit that topic. Dkt. # 280 . The Attorneys' Eyes Only Protective Orders (Dkt. ## 183 , 192 ) are sufficient and the Court is not convinced that, based upon the record, there is any reason to modify or revise what was previously approved. With respect to Defendants' clawback requests, if Defendants believe they have a basis, they need to file a motion. The Court reserves further decisions pending its decision on the requested in-camera document review. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER ON SANCTIONS: Plaintiffs' request for sanctions in connection with the litigation of Plaintiffs' motion for sanctions (Dkt. # 137 ) is GRANTED. Dkt. # 231 . Within 30 (thirty) days of the date of this order, Defendants are ordered to pay $36,738.04, along with the $50,507.92 previously ordered (see Dkt. # 223 ), to the Perkins Coie Trust Account. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 329 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motions to Seal (Dkt. Nos. 311 , 315 ). Exhibits 1-3 of the Hyatt Declaration (Dkt. # 314 ) and Exhibits C-F of the Sepe Declaration (Dkt. # 318 ) shall remain under seal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 260 Motion to Compel: Defendants are ordered to reproduce the 25 documents in Plaintiffs' motion consistent with the parameters outlined above within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 294 Motion to Seal Exhibits 1-25. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 221 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 226 Cross Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting Defendants' Motions to file the Declarations of Mr. Groh, Mr. Tabb, Mr. Emrich, and Mr. Allen ex parte and in camera; re Dkts. 227 , 267 . Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (SWT)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 240 Motion to Seal: Plaintiffs may retain the unredacted versions of Plaintiff's Reply to their Motion to Compel and Opposition to Defendants Cross-Motion (Dkt. # 244), and Exhibits C-K to the Ahmed Declaration (Dkt. ## 245-53), under seal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel as to the Paragraph 17 documents (Dkt. # 152 ) and granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. # 230 ). Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting in part and denying in part and reserving ruling in part Plaintiff's 152 Motion to Compel. Within fourteen (14) days of this Order, Defendants are instructed to produce a randomly-selected sample of 10 documents from Paragraph 17 of the Emrich Affidavit for in camera review for this Court. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting parties' 210 Stipulated Motion to Set Briefing Schedule on Discovery Disputes. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel due 1/3/2019, Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Motion for Protective Or der due 1/17/2019, Plaintiffs' Joint Reply in Support of Motion to Compel and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order due 1/31/2019, Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order due 2/14/2019. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (PM)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER re Plaintiffs' 152 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Re Deliberative Process Privilege. The Court reserves ruling on the motion pending supplemental briefing. Plaintiffs must file their supplemental brief within seven (7) days from the date of this Order; the Government will have five (5) days to respond; Plaintiffs will then have five (5) days to reply. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER re Defendants' 156 Emergency Motion to Stay pending appellate review. The Court understands this motion to be one for reconsideration of its April 11, 2018 Order denying in part Defendants' motion for a protective order. (Dkt. # 148 ). The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion for reconsideration. (Dkt. # 156 ). Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting Defendants' 147 Motion for Leave to Submit Documents Ex Parte, In Camera signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER re Defendants' 156 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 148 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Pending Appellate Review. The Court requires the Government to identify the total number of potential cl ass members to the Court. The Court then requires a random sampling of these members with explanations why their names may not be produced to Plaintiffs. The Government must file these case-by-case determinations with the Court within seven (7) days from the date of this Order. The Court will reserve ruling on this motion for reconsideration pending review of the Government's samples. The Court finds it appropriate to stay the April 25, 2018 deadline to produce the unredacted class list until the Court has ruled on the motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER re Defendants' 156 Emergency Motion for stay pending appellate review. The Court will make a determination as to the motion's merits on Tuesday, April 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 109 Motion to Compel Re Law Enforcement Privilege; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 111 Motion to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to RFPS 40, 41 and 44; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 126 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 134 Motion for leave to file an over-length brief. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER on LCR 37 Submission Regarding Requests for Production Nos. 23 & 24 re Plaintiffs' 103 MOTION to Expedite. The Court orders the parties to meet and confer within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to discuss alternative c ustodians, non-custodial sources, search terms, and other means of review that Defendants will use to search for relevant documents. Defendants shall conduct their search of the records within ten (10) days of the parties' meeting. Defendants will then have thirty (30) days to produce relevant records, if any exist, to Plaintiffs or, in the alternative, to produce a privilege log. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying Defendants' 99 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 91 Motion to Compel Production of Documents. The Court orders the parties to meet and confer and submit a joint status report thereafter in accordance with this Order. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying Defendants' 73 Motion to Reconsideration Class Certification, signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (SWT)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting plaintiffs' 49 Motion to Certify Class; granting in part and denying in part defendants' 56 Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER denying Government's 39 motion to transfer venue. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER granting 45 stipulated motion to extend Defendants' time to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for class certification 26 ; granting Plaintiffs' 42 motion for leave to file a second amended complaint; Amended complaint due within 30 days; staying until further notice Defendants' 39 motion to transfer venue. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 35 Motion for extension of time to response to Plaintiffs' 26 Motion to Certify Class. Response due 4/10/2017. Plaintiffs' 26 Motion to Certify Class is RENOTED to 4/14/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagafe et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdiqafar Wagafe
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Glenda Melinda Aldana Madrid
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Represented By: Lee Gelernt(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Nicholas Peter Gellert
Represented By: Hugh E Handeyside
Represented By: Kristin Macleod-Ball(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David A. Perez
Represented By: Trina Realmuto(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathryn Reddy
Represented By: Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Represented By: Hina Shamsi(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Stacy Tolchin(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehdi Ostadhassan
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Glenda Melinda Aldana Madrid
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Represented By: Lee Gelernt(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Nicholas Peter Gellert
Represented By: Hugh E Handeyside
Represented By: Kristin Macleod-Ball(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David A. Perez
Represented By: Trina Realmuto(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathryn Reddy
Represented By: Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Represented By: Hina Shamsi(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Stacy Tolchin(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Aaron R Petty
Represented By: Edward S. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kelly
Represented By: Aaron R Petty
Represented By: Edward S. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Scialabba
Represented By: Aaron R Petty
Represented By: Edward S. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew D Emrich
Represented By: Aaron R Petty
Represented By: Edward S. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M Renaud
Represented By: Aaron R Petty
Represented By: Edward S. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Represented By: Aaron R Petty
Represented By: Edward S. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?