Frisvold et al v. Pentair Filtration Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Larry Frisvold and Cindy Frisvold
Defendant: Pentair Filtration Solutions LLC, Pentair Aqua Eco Systems, Inc., Pentair Sales US, Inc., Pentair Flow Control AG Corporation, Pentair Flow Technologies, LLC, Pentair SSC US Co., Pentair Thermal Management LLC, Pentair Valves & Controls US LP and Corporate Doe 1
Case Number: 2:2017cv00136
Filed: January 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 33 Motion to Compel Discovery signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying defendants' 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; granting plaintiffs' 26 Motion to Amend Complaint to Join Additional Parties, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER withdrawing Attorney Richard Pearce and substituting Attorneys R Lind Stapley and Kyle M. Butler for Plaintiffs Cindy Frisvold and Larry Frisvold. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM) copy of order sent via ECF ad hoc to attorney Richard Pearce
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frisvold et al v. Pentair Filtration Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Frisvold
Represented By: Kyle M. Butler
Represented By: R Lind Stapley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Frisvold
Represented By: Kyle M. Butler
Represented By: R Lind Stapley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentair Filtration Solutions LLC
Represented By: Daniel J Gunter
Represented By: Laura P. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentair Aqua Eco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Gunter
Represented By: Laura P. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentair Sales US, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Gunter
Represented By: Laura P. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentair Flow Control AG Corporation
Represented By: Daniel J Gunter
Represented By: Laura P. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentair Flow Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J Gunter
Represented By: Laura P. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentair SSC US Co.
Represented By: Daniel J Gunter
Represented By: Laura P. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentair Thermal Management LLC
Represented By: Daniel J Gunter
Represented By: Laura P. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentair Valves & Controls US LP
Represented By: Daniel J Gunter
Represented By: Laura P. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporate Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?