Hotel Rio Vista Inc v. Tyco SimplexGrinnell et al
Plaintiff: Hotel Rio Vista Inc
Defendant: Tyco SimplexGrinnell, SimplexGrinnell LP, Corporate Does 1-3 and Does 1-3
Case Number: 2:2017cv00157
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Atty Richard Pearce via email)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the above-captioned case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(b)(4), by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. If plaintiff's counsel has not filed an Attorney Admission Petition or has not associated new counsel and/or shown adequate cause by 4:30 pm on Thursday, May 25, 2017, this matter will be dismissed. (SWT)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by February 22, 2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Clerk of Court shall note the Order to Show Cause on the Court's calendar for Friday, February 24, 2017. (KERR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hotel Rio Vista Inc v. Tyco SimplexGrinnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hotel Rio Vista Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco SimplexGrinnell
Represented By: Eric Peter Gillett
Represented By: Amber R Hazelquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SimplexGrinnell LP
Represented By: Eric Peter Gillett
Represented By: Amber R Hazelquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporate Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?