Legaspi v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Erlynn C Legaspi
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2017cv00166
Filed: February 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: James P. Donohue
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting plaintiff's 24 Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER adopting the 21 Report and Recommendation. The final decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED and the case is REMANDED to the Social Security Administration for further administrative proceedings consistent with the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting defendant's 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; defendant's answer to plaintiff's complaint shall be due on or before 8/2/2017, signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legaspi v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erlynn C Legaspi
Represented By: Francisco Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?