Kirby Offshore Marine Pacific LLC v. Emerald Services Inc
Plaintiff: Kirby Offshore Marine Pacific LLC
Defendant: Emerald Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv00224
Filed: February 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 951
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re: Award of Costs to Defendant re parties' 73 Stipulation. Defendant is awarded costs in the amount of $5,000 against plaintiff, and Judgment shall be entered. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION directing Clerk to enter judgment against plaintiff Kirby Offshore Marine Pacific, LLC, and in favor of Emerald Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendant's 28 Motions in Limine, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Stipulated Motion for a Limited Extension of the Discovery Deadline. Discovery to be completed by 12/22/2017. Sgned by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; re parties' 22 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying Defendant's 5 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER FROM THE COURT re parties' 17 Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Court is declining to sign. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirby Offshore Marine Pacific LLC v. Emerald Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby Offshore Marine Pacific LLC
Represented By: Markus B G Oberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerald Services Inc
Represented By: Shannon M. Benbow
Represented By: Philip B Grennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?