Tiwari et al v. Mattis
Plaintiff: Kirti Tiwari, Seung Yoon Yang, Amandeep Singh, Duncan Makau, Valdeta Mehanja, Luobin Sun and Rui Zhang
Defendant: James Mattis
Case Number: 2:2017cv00242
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER amending its previous 192 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment consistent with the prior Order, docket no. 192 . Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment consistent with this Order and to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MINUTE ORDER deferring to Pretrial Conference defendant's 157 MOTIONS IN LIMINE for Protective Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MINUTE ORDER denying in part and deferring in part plaintiff's 155 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ; denying in part, striking in part and deferring in part defendant's 154 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ; deferring to Pretrial Conference defendant's 158 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 150 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant may file, on or before 10/25/2018, a motion asserting the state secrets privilege. Any response shall be filed by noon on 11/7/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE ORDER AMENDING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES; Bench Trial is set for 11/26/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Motions in Limine due by 10/18/2018, Pretrial Order due by 11/9/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 11/9/2018, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 11/12/2018, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiffs' 115 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying defendant's 132 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 123 Motion for Protective Order; staying discovery pending resolution of cross-motions for summary judgment; granting in part and striking as moot in part Plaintiffs' 130 Motion to Compel Discovery; RENOTING Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment, dkts 115 , 132 : Noting Date 7/6/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 119 Stipulation Setting Deadlines for Briefing; RENOTING Plaintiffs' 115 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment : Noting Date 6/1/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 78 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (Follows oral order of 3/21/2018, Dkt. 114 ) (SWT)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MINUTE ORDER: To ensure this document becomes part of the record, the Court attaches to this Minute Order as Exhibit A the handout circulated by counsel for Defendant during the hearing held on March 21, 2018. See docket no. 114 . Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiffs' 102 Motion for Order Precluding Speaking Objections ; denying defendant's 85 Motion to Strike Declaration of Kevin H. Govern ; denying defendant's 109 Motion to Strike References to Plaintiff Qi Xiong and Non-Parties Dongwoo Kim and Yang Zhidong. No further materials relating to plaintiffs' 112 Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be filed by any party prior to Oral Argument. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND RELATED DATES: Length of trial - 5 days; Jury Trial is set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 6/1/20 18, Motions due by 6/7/2018, Discovery completed by 8/9/2018, Dispositive motions due by 8/23/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2018, Motions in Limine due by 10/4/2018, Pretrial Order due by 10/19/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/19/2018, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/19/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER directing Defendant to serve and file any objections to the First Discovery Requests on or before January 12, 2018; RENOTING Plaintiffs' 78 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Noting Date 2/2/2018, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER. The Court has reviewed Defendant's Notice of Intent to File Surreply, docket no. 81 . Defendant's surreply, if any, shall be filed no later than January 5, 2018, and shall not exceed seven (7) pages. Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's surreply, if any, shall be due on January 19, 2018, and shall not exceed seven (7) pages. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, docket no. 78 , is RENOTED for January 19, 2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING Plaintiffs' 67 MOTION to Lift Stay of Discovery ; Noting Date 9/29/2017, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 66 Stipulated Motion to Stay Plaintiff's Motion to Certify class as follows: The September 8, 2017, noting date for plaintiffs' motion to certify class, docket no. 64 , is STRICKEN, and the Court hereby stays consideration of plaintiffs' motion pending the Court's ruling on defendant's forthcoming motion to dismiss. Should the Court deny defendant's motion to dismiss, defendant's opposition to plaintiffs' motion to certify class shall be due within fourteen (14) days of the date of the Courts Order denying defendants motion. Plaintiffs' reply shall be due within seven (7) days after defendant's response is filed. Authorized signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER extending the deadline for defendant James Mattis to answer or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Complaint to 9/5/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 51 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (Plaintiffs shall electronically file the Third Amended Complaint via CM/ECF within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order) ; striking as moot Defendant's 49 Motion to Dismiss ; striking as moot Defendant's 57 Motion to Stay Discovery. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER granting 58 Stipulated Motion to renote motion; defendant's 57 MOTION to Stay Discovery is renoted for 8/11/2017 signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Defendant until June 29, 2017 to file its consolidated motion to dismiss and supplemental opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction; re parties' 45 Stipulation Extending Defendant's Deadline to File, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 43 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Deadline and Page Limitation, ; RENOTING plaintiffs' 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Noting Date 7/21/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER renoting Plaintiffs' 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; Noting Date is now 6/30/2017; Defendant's supplemental response due 6/26/2017; reply due by the new noting date. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 24 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall electronically file the Amended Complaint via the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; Noting Date 5/19/2017, re parties' 19 Stipulation. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiwari et al v. Mattis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirti Tiwari
Represented By: Neil T O'Donnell(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Joseph R Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seung Yoon Yang
Represented By: Neil T O'Donnell(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Joseph R Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amandeep Singh
Represented By: Neil T O'Donnell(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Joseph R Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duncan Makau
Represented By: Neil T O'Donnell(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Joseph R Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valdeta Mehanja
Represented By: Neil T O'Donnell(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Joseph R Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luobin Sun
Represented By: Neil T O'Donnell(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Joseph R Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rui Zhang
Represented By: Neil T O'Donnell(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Joseph R Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mattis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?