Fish, LLC v. Harbor Marine Maintenance & Supply, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fish LLC
Defendant: Harbor Marine Maintenance & Supply Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv00245
Filed: February 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 75 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal. The action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER vacating trial scheduled for 6/4/2018; directing parties to submit, within thirty (30) days of this order, either a stipulated motion to dismiss or a joint status report; terminating outstanding motions in limine (dkts. 61 , 63 ); statistically closing this case. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting Defendant's 55 Motion for Judicial Settlement Conference. The case is referred to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Mary Alice Theiler for a settlement conference, which the parties are ORDERED to attend. The parties are INSTRUCTED to contact Judge Theiler's chambers to schedule the conference. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Judge Theiler)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER. The parties are INSTRUCTED to propose jury instructions on a joint basis, with any disputes noted, and include a proposed joint verdict form with the proposed joint jury instructions. The parties are further INSTRUCTED to file pre-trial motions, if any, no later than May 3, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 42 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 30 Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Discovery. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 28 Stipulation for Extension of the Discovery Cutoff for Purposes of the Deposition of Plaintiff's Marine Surveyor. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 18 Motion to Compel. Defendant is DIRECTED to provide Plaintiffs an unredacted copy of LodeStar Marine's Survey and Consulting Report for Loss Report File #16-C0229 dated May 24, 2016. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(PM)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER. Defendant is DIRECTED to provide the Court no later than Monday, November 27, 2017 an unredacted copy of LodeStar Marine's May 24, 2016 Survey and Consulting Report prepared by Lynne Reister for purposes of in camera review. The Clerk is DIRECTED to renote Plaintiff's motion to compel (Dkt. No. 18 ) to November 27, 2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 11 Stipulated Motion for Filing Amended Complaint. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting stipulation to withdraw attorney Donald W. Carter and substitute attorneys William Lawrence Black, III and Jeremy Jones for Harbor Marine Maintenance & Supply Inc by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fish, LLC v. Harbor Marine Maintenance & Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fish LLC
Represented By: Matthew Clayton Crane
Represented By: Robert D Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Marine Maintenance & Supply Inc
Represented By: Donald William Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?