Perez v. Kelly et al
Plaintiff: Pedro Tomas Perez Perez
Defendant: John F Kelly, Lori Scialabba, Ron Rosenberg and Laura B Zuchowski
Case Number: 2:2017cv00249
Filed: February 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: The court DENIES Mr. Perez's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. # 17 ) and GRANTS the Government's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. # 24 ). The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of the Government. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Government's 24 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing this administrative appeal for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Elaine A. Duke and James McCament added. John F Kelly (Secretary of Homeland Security) and Lori Scialabba (Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services) terminated.)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Defendants' unopposed 28 Motion for Extension of Time in which to File Reply re: 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Reply due 10/16/2017. The 17 Motion for Summary Judgment is noted for 10/27/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 25 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's optional Reply due 9/25/2017. Defendants' optional Reply due 10/9/2017. Parties' motions shall be noted for 10/20/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting Defendants' 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time (Third) to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion is due September 5, 2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Defendants' unopposed 20 Motion for Second Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion due 9/1/2017 and shall be noted for 10/13/2017; Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply due 9/18/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Defendants' unopposed 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Cross-Motion and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion due 8/28/2017, and shall be noted for 10/6/2017. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's optional Reply due 9/11/2017. Defendants' optional Reply due 9/25/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due 7/3/2017; Defendants' Cross-Motion fur Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion due 8/14/2017; Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion and Plaintiff's optional Reply due 8/28/2017; Defendants' optional Reply due 9/11/2017. (PM)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing parties to file second JSR within 10 days by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Tomas Perez Perez
Represented By: Henry Marcus Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F Kelly
Represented By: Walter Manning Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Scialabba
Represented By: Walter Manning Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Rosenberg
Represented By: Walter Manning Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura B Zuchowski
Represented By: Walter Manning Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?