Gelinas et al v. Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB et al
Plaintiff: David R Gelinas and Karen M Gelinas
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Selene Finance and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2017cv00300
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting defendants' 8 Motion to Dismiss signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS) cc plaintiffs
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER per Plaintiffs' 9 Response to Order to Show Cause. Defendants' motion to dismiss 8 is noted for 6/16/2017; Plaintiffs' response due 6/12/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) cc: plaintiffs via the USPO
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. Status Conference set for 5/23/2017 is VACATED. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) cc: Plaintiffs via the USPS
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gelinas et al v. Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R Gelinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen M Gelinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?