Uppal v. Kelly et al
Petitioner: Daljinder Singh Uppal
Respondent: John Kelly, Jefferson B Sessions III, Natalie R Asher, Brian Martin, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 2:2017cv00306
Filed: February 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: James P. Donohue
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 Report and Recommendations; granting Government's 8 Motion to Dismiss; Petitioner's habeas petition is DENIED, and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENTS TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD BY 6/26/17; clerk directed to renote respondents' motion to dismiss for 6/26/17 by Hon. James P. Donohue. (RS)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Hon. James P. Donohue granting 10 Joint Stipulated Motion to Continue Motion Noting Date; directing Clerk to RE-NOTE 9 RETURN and STATUS REPORT and Motion to Dismiss re 8 Return & Status Report for 5/26/2017. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uppal v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daljinder Singh Uppal
Represented By: Mark Barrett Nerheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Kelly
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson B Sessions III
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Natalie R Asher
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Martin
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Justice
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?