Zamora v. United States of America
Petitioner: Jose Lucas Zamora
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2017cv00346
Filed: March 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying Petitioner's 1 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence Under 28 USC § 2255 ; denying Petitioner a certificate of appealability under 28 U.S.C. § 2253, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Petitioner via USPS)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Petitioner's 11 Motion for Extension of Time; directing Clerk to RENOTE 7 MOTION/RESPONSE to 1 Motion to Vacate : Noting Date 6/16/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Petitioner via USPS)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting petitioner's 8 Motion for Extension of Time; petitioner may file his brief by 6/5/17; clerk directed to renote petitioner's 2255 motion/govt's response for 6/5/17 by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS) cc petitioner
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zamora v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Lucas Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Helen J Brunner
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?