Lindsay v. Key Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Matthew James Lindsay, Esq.
Defendant: Key Bank National Association, Recon Trust Co National Association, Bank of America, Turnbull and Born PLLC, Recon Trust Company NA and Arlene Bob
Case Number: 2:2017cv00354
Filed: March 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying plaintiff's 19 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) cc plaintiff
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (cc Plaintiff via USPS)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR CLARIFICATION AND TO SHOW CAUSE TO DEFENDANTS; Defendants' Show Cause Response and plaintiff's clarification due by 5/19/2017, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) cc plaintiff
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying plaintiff's 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Show Cause Response due by 4/21/2017, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) cc plaintiff
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and RECOMMENDATION for Review. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (swt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsay v. Key Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew James Lindsay, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Bank National Association
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recon Trust Co National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turnbull and Born PLLC
Represented By: James Adrian Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recon Trust Company NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene Bob
Represented By: James Adrian Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?