Veridian Credit Union v. Eddie Bauer LLC
Plaintiff: Veridian Credit Union
Defendant: Eddie Bauer LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00356
Filed: March 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 FINAL APPROVAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT re: Plaintiff's 166 Motion for Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 163 Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER directing parties to, no later than 4/26/2019, file either a motion for preliminary approval of the settlement or, if the parties are unable to file such a motion by that date, a joint status report explaining the status of this matter. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER withdrawing Michelle Peterson's appointment as special master in this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Special Master Michelle Peterson terminated)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Withdrawing Special Master Appointment. The court intends to withdraw Ms. Petersons appointment as special master in this case on 2/25/2019. The court ORDERS any party that wishes to respond to the court's plan to file a brief not to exceed three pages no later than 2/22/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION AND ORDER vacating pending deadlines and staying case until 2/22/2019, re parties' 152 Stipulated Motion. Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 2/22/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE ORDER re Special Master's 146 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Defendant Eddie Bauer, LLC's attorney fee declaration must be filed by 1/10/2019. Any Response must be filed by 1/18/2019. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER signed by Judge James L. Robart. Pursuant to Rule 53 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the terms of this order, the court appoints Michelle Peterson to serve as Special Master. (Attachments: # 1 Rule 53 Declaration of Michelle Peterson) (PM)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER directing any party that opposes the appointment of Michelle Peterson as Special Master re: discovery disputes to file a brief no later than 10/8/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Michelle Peterson via ECF ad hoc
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER re: discovery disputes; directing full briefing on these issues pursuant to the local rules. Defendant's motion due 10/4/2018, Plaintiff's response due 10/15/2018, Defendant's reply due 10/19/2018. A hearing on the motion is set for 11/1/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart. The court further STAYS the class certification deadlines pending resolution of these issues. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER re: parties' 129 Stipulation. It is ORDERED, that deadline for conducting depositions is continued to October 11, 2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 115 Motion to Compel signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER re: privilege log dispute. Parties are directed to file separate statements of no more than three (3) pages no later than Thursday, August 2, 2018, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER re: discovery dispute and directing additional briefing. Defendant Eddie Bauer to file an appropriate discovery motion; Plaintiff to respond. Court orders parties to meet and confer to attempt to resolve the dispute and to file a supplemental brief by no later than the noting date of Defendant's discovery motion. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER re: discovery requests - directing parties to file separate statements further explaining the nature of the discovery dispute. Statements due no later than Wednesday, July 25, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER re: 102 Stipulated MOTION Alter Class Certification Schedule. Telephone Conference set for 7/9/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart. The 102 Stipulated Motion is renote for 7/9/2018. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting parties' 99 Stipulated Motion to Alter Class Certification Schedule; Discovery related to certification motion completed by 7/13/2018, Motion for class certification due by 8/10/2018, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 87 Motion to Seal. Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Joseph P. Guglielmo in Support of the Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 93 ) is hereby sealed. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER directing Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's 85 MOTION to Compel no later than 5/7/2018 at 5:00 p.m. After response is filed, parties are directed to meet and confer and file a supplemental brief by 5/11/2018 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re: Plaintiff's 85 Motion to Compel Defendant Eddie Bauer, LLC to produce responsive documents and a privilege log. The court STRIKES Veridian's motion (Dkt. # 85 ) without prejudice to refiling the motion in a manner that comports with the court's scheduling order. The court ORDERS Eddie Bauer to respond to the motion to seal 87 no later than Wednesday, May 2, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 78 Stipulated Motion to Establish New Class Discovery Deadline and Class Certification Schedule. Class certification deadline extended to May 22, 2018; Plaintiff's Motion for class certification deadline extended to Wednesday, June 6, 2018. Clerk is directed to cancel the February 13, 2018 telephone conference (see 2/6/2018 Dkt. Entry). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER striking Plaintiff's 74 Motion to Compel without prejudice to refiling the motion in a manner that comports with the court's scheduling order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 71 Stipulated Motion to Continue Deadline to Respond to Second Amended Complaint. Defendant's deadline is extended to 12/21/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC's 40 Motion to Dismiss; Veridian may file an amended complaint that is consistent with court's rulings herein. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(SWT)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 64 Stipulated Motion to Alter Class Certification Schedule. Discovery relating to Plaintiff's class certification motion to be completed by 2/27/2018, Plaintiff's Motion for class certification due by 4/25/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AGREEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND ORDER signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 59 Stipulated MOTION, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge James L. Robart. Discovery to be completed by 10/30/2017, Motions for class certification due by 11/30/2017. This scheduling order incorporates the deadlines set forth in Docket No. 52 and supplants that order. (PM)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Stipulated Motion to alter class certification schedule. Deadline for plaintiff to file their class certification motion is 11/30/2017; discovery on class certification to be completed by 10/30/2017. This deadline should not be construed as a bifurcation of discovery. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting Defendant's 37 Motion for Leave to File an Over-Length Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint; not to exceed 30 pages. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting defendant's 26 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Judge James L. Robart.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veridian Credit Union v. Eddie Bauer LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veridian Credit Union
Represented By: Chase Christian Alvord
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Erin Green Comite(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Gary F Lynch(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Karen H Riebel(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Stephen J Teti(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kevin W Tucker(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Bauer LLC
Represented By: Dyanne Cho(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Sarah E. Demaree
Represented By: Jon P Kardassakis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathleen A Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?