Medchoice Risk Retention Group, Inc v. Katz et al
Plaintiff: Medchoice Risk Retention Group Inc
Defendant: Steven Katz MD and REI Protect LLC
Counter_claimant: Steven Katz MD and REI Protect LLC
Counter_defendant: Medchoice Risk Retention Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv00387
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Defendant's 37 Petition for Fees and Dismissing all Claims Against All Parties with Prejudice; MedChoice shall pay fees and costs to REI Protect LLC in the amount of $44,450.00, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Defendants' 7 Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying Plaintiff's 22 Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award. Arbitrator Rasmussen's Final Award is CONFIRMED and MedChoice's claims in this action are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(TH)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING defendants' 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Noting Date 6/23/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 11 Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending Outcome of Their Summary Judgment Motion. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medchoice Risk Retention Group, Inc v. Katz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medchoice Risk Retention Group Inc
Represented By: Cindy M. Lin
Represented By: Suzanne Kelly Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Katz MD
Represented By: Benjamin J Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REI Protect LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Steven Katz MD
Represented By: Benjamin J Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: REI Protect LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Medchoice Risk Retention Group Inc
Represented By: Cindy M. Lin
Represented By: Suzanne Kelly Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?