Johnson v. Allen et al
Plaintiff: Lee Patrick Johnson
Defendant: Michael Allen, Schneider, Cline, County of King, W. Higgs, Hyatt and Joseph Marchesano
Case Number: 2:2017cv00389
Filed: March 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER ADOPTING 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; Overruling Mr. Johnson's objections (Dkt. No. # 59 ). In addition, the court GRANTS Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. # 46 ), DENIES Mr. Johnson's cross-motion for summary judgment (Dkt. # 56 ), and DISMISSES Mr. Johnson's claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Lee Johnson, Prisoner ID: 334101) (TH)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 44 Report and Recommendations, plaintiff's 45 Objections to Report and Recommendation; Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Captain Cline are DISMISSED without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute; This matter is RE-REFERRED to Hon. Brian A Tsuchida for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Lee Johnson, Prisoner ID: 334101)(SWT) (Cline (Captain) terminated.)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER extending to 11/29/2017 Plaintiff's deadline to serve the amended complaint on "Captain Cline" or the individual identified as the staff person who signed the grievance appeal on June 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Brian A Tsuchida. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Lee Johnson, Prisoner ID: 334101)(PM)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class Mail and Procedures; mailed on 9/13/2017 to Defendant Captain Cline; General Order sent to Pltf. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Lee Johnson, Prisoner ID: 334101)(TH) (cc: Served Defendant Captain Cline a copy of original complaint, amended complaint w/ attachments, Court's Report and Recommendation and Order Dismissing Claims and Defendants, and a copy of this order along with two copies of the Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, a Waiver of Service of Summons, and a return envelope, postage prepaid, addressed to the Clerks office.)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery completed by 11/29/2017, Dispositive motions due by 12/29/2017, by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Lee Johnson, Prisoner ID: 334101)(TH)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER directing plaintiff to provide the Court with a current service address for defendant Captain Cline by 8/15/2017. If plaintiff is unable to do so or requires additional time, he should file documentation describing the steps he has taken to obtain defendant Cline's current address and explain why he is unable to comply with this Order. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (PM) cc: plaintiff via the U.S. Mail
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO PROVIDE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AS TO DEFENDANT CLINE'S ADDRESS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (RS)cc Marchesano, Allen, Johnson
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AND DEFENDANTS RE 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge James L. Robart. With the exception of plaintiff's claim concerning the opening, copying and distributing to Deputy Prosecuting Attorney Joseph Marchesano of p laintiff's letter mailed on May 10, 2016 to Freda Hayes, all other claims are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Defendant(s) Sgt. Schneider, Major Hyatt, Director W. Higgs and King County are DISMISSED from this action. This matter is re-referred to Judge Tsuchida for further proceedings. (cc: plaintiff)(ST)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel by Judge James L. Robart. (cc: plaintiff)(ST)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TRO (Dkts. 6-7) re 10 Report and Recommendations by Judge James L. Robart. (cc: plaintiff)(ST)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Patrick Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Higgs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Marchesano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?