BioPure Healing Products, LLC v. WellNX Life Sciences, Inc
Plaintiff: BioPure Healing Products, LLC
Defendant: WellNX Life Sciences, Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv00470
Filed: March 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James P. Donohue
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (KMP)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER directing parties to comply with LCR 26(c) re parties' 56 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order ; parties shall submit a proper redline version to the Court by no later than Wednesday, September 20, 2017. Authorized by Hon. James P. Donohue. (SWT)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff may file an optional response to defendants' 65 Supplement by no later than Friday, September 15, 2017. Authorized by Hon. James P. Donohue. (SWT)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information re parties' 57 Agreement Regarding Discovery and ESI, signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (SWT)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 20 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; re 49 Report and Recommendations, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time to File Objections re parties' 51 Stipulated Motion; reset deadlines as to 49 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : Objections to R&R due by 7/28/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Judge Hon. James P. Donohue, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 18 Stipulated Motion to Seal, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 12 STIPULATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Hon. James P. Donohue. Answer due 5/17/2017. All other deadlines remain in effect, including the June 14, 2017 deadline for the parties to consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. (KMP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BioPure Healing Products, LLC v. WellNX Life Sciences, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BioPure Healing Products, LLC
Represented By: Marc C Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WellNX Life Sciences, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?