Curtis v. Leathers et al
Plaintiff: James Edward Curtis
Defendant: Leathers and Washington Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2017cv00474
Filed: March 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING 36 Report and Recommendation. Defendant Leathers a/k/a Jaclyn Jorgenson is dismissed without prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Curtis, Prisoner ID: 984533) (TH)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Court Order to Direct US Marshal to Attempt Personal Service on Defendant Leathers (aka Jaclyn Jorgenson) signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Curtis, Prisoner ID: 984533)(SWT) (cc: USMO with summons, USM 285 forms, complaint)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 27 Motion for Reconsideration AND GRANTING 28 Motion Directing Clerk to Issue Summons signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Curtis, Prisoner ID: 984533)(AE)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF DISMISSAL adopting 21 Report and Recommendation re 15 MOTION to Dismiss; all claims against the DOC are dismissed with prejudice. This matter is re-referred to Judge Tsuchida for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Curtis, Prisoner ID: 984533) (TH)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service. Plaintiff shall attempt to effect personal service no later than September 26, 2017. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Curtis, Prisoner ID: 984533) (TH)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER renoting plaintiff's 23 MOTION for Extension of Time ; Noting Date 9/8/2017. Counsel for defendants shall indicate by 9/6/17 whether counsel will accept service on behalf of Leathers, or whether Mr. Curtis should attempt to effect personal service by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Curtis, Prisoner ID: 984533)(RS)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Brian A. Tsuchida as to why Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Leathers (FNU), a/k/a Jaclyn Jorgenson should not be dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 8/31/2017,. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (James Curtis, Prisoner ID: 984533) (PM)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND PROCEDURES; clerk directed to serve Jaclyn Jorgenson by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Curtis, Prisoner ID: 984533)(RS)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DECLINING SERVICE AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND re plaintiff's 12 Motion for leave to conduct pre-service discovery to obtain the full name and address of dft Leathers (FNU); defendant to provide information under seal within 10 days of this order signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Curtis, Prisoner ID: 984533)(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Leathers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?