HTC Corporation et al v. Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson et al
Plaintiff: HTC Corporation and HTC America Inc
Defendant: Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson and Ericsson Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv00534
Filed: April 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 46 Motion to Dismiss of Transfer. The motion to transfer is granted, and this matter shall be transferred to the Eastern District of Texas; the motion to dismiss is denied. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Case will be sent to the US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas by electronic transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. (SWT)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER REGARDING 76 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND CASE SCHEDULE signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Jury Trial is set for 7/22/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Discovery completed by 11/1/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FR CP 26(a)(2) due by 12/1/2018, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 12/20/2018, Dispositive motions due by 3/25/2019, Plaintiffs Pretrial Statement due by 4/19/2019, Defendants Pretrial Statement due by 5/1/2019, Conference of Attorneys compl eted by 5/10/2019, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/10/2019, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 7/10/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (see order for more deadlines) (PM)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 51 Motion to Seal. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, as well as Exhibits W-Z, AD-AF, AX, AZ and BG to the Declaration of Kevin A. Zeck in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, shall REMAIN SEALED. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 44 Joint Motion for Protective Order signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 21 Stipulated Motion approving second extension of time to 9/25/17 to respond to complaint signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 17 Stipulated Motion; Ericsson Inc answer due 7/27/2017; Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson answer due 7/27/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HTC Corporation et al v. Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HTC Corporation
Represented By: Nellie J Amjadi(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Dale R Bish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Olivia M Kim(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Albert Shih(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Represented By: Jamie J Yoo(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: James C Yoon(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HTC America Inc
Represented By: Nellie J Amjadi(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Dale R Bish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Olivia M Kim(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Albert Shih(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Represented By: Jamie J Yoo(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: James C Yoon(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?