American Civil Liberties Union of Washington et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Washington, American Civil Liberties Union of Montana and American Civil Liberties Union of North Dakota
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 2:2017cv00562
Filed: April 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal re parties' 52 Stipulation, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting Defendants' 48 Consent Motion to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Parties shall file a Joint Status Report within thirty days of the restoration of appropriations. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SWT)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re 45 Joint Status Report and Joint Motion to Set Case Deadlines. Discovery completed by 11/1/2018, Dispositive motions due by 1/31/2019. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the deadline to submit the Joint Status Report from 1/31/2018 to 3/2/2018. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Defendants shall complete their review and processing of the remaining, approximately 150 outstanding records identified as potentially responsive to Plaintiffs' FOIA request, and produce to Plaintiffs all non-exempt, responsive records, by January 19, 2018. (PM)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re Status Conference on 10/17/17; By January 31, 2018, the parties shall submit a joint status report and proposed case schedule to the Court (See Order for more details), signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Extending Time to Submit Joint Status Report; Joint Status Report due by 8/25/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying Defendants' 11 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision on Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 10 Stipulated Motion for extension of deadline to 6/29/17 to respond to complaint; Joint Status Report extended to 6/20/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union of Washington et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Washington
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Represented By: Eric M Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Montana
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Represented By: Eric M Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of North Dakota
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Represented By: Eric M Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Matthew J Berns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Matthew J Berns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?