Ville v. Family Resource Home Care
Plaintiff: Isatu Ville
Defendant: Family Resource Home Care
Case Number: 2:2017cv00606
Filed: April 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting Defendant's 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting Defendant's 44 Motion for Extension of Time; RENOTING Defendant's 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Noting Date 9/7/2018; CONTINUING Jury Trial to 1/22/2019 and all case-related deadlines for 90 days. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Defendant's 22 Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures. Plaintiff to serve on Defendant her required Initial Disclosures no later than 14 days from the date of this Order. Defendant's request for attorney's fees and costs is DENIED at this time. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Counsel's 21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew Furness and Furness Law are allowed to withdraw from this matter and no longer represent Plaintiff. The Court DECLINES TO APPOINT replacement counsel at this time. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING TO PRO BONO PANEL re plaintiff's 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel; clerk directed to renote motion for 7/14/17 by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) cc plaintiff, S Haas
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to seal attachment/complaint; plaintiff to re-file her redacted proposed complaint within 30 days by Hon. James P. Donohue.(RS) cc plaintiff
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ville v. Family Resource Home Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isatu Ville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Resource Home Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?