McCreary v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Carl McCreary
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2017cv00615
Filed: April 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 19 Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 16 Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this case is reversed and remanded pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) to the Commissioner of Social Security for further administrative proceedings pursuant to this Court's ORDER of remand, issued on September 19th, 2017. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCreary v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl McCreary
Represented By: George Andre Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?