Market Place North Condominium Association v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Market Place North Condominium Association
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv00625
Filed: April 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting Plaintiff Market Place North Condominium Association's 57 Motion to Compel Certain Depositions. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting in part plaintiff's 35 Motion to Compel Documents, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying Defendant's 45 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AGREEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 16 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; Plaintiff shall electronically file its amended complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 13 Stipulation; the following deadlines are EXTENDED: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/8/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/22/2018, Joint Status Report due by 1/22/2018, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER denying parties' 11 Stipulation for Entry of Stay ; extending deadlines as follows: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/1/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/15/2017, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 12/15/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Market Place North Condominium Association v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Market Place North Condominium Association
Represented By: Zachary O McIsaac
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Represented By: Maria E Sotirhos
Represented By: Scott M Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?