Liu v. Kell
Plaintiff: Li Liu
Defendant: Keegan Kell
Case Number: 2:2017cv00640
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PRAECIPE re #64 Sealed Document,, FAFSA Application Redacted by Defendant Keegan Kell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 64-6 2017-2018 FAFSA Application)(Jaeggli, Robert)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Li Liu, to #60 Second MOTION to Seal . (Theriot-Orr, Devin)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification #64 Declaration of Katrina Zalfiro and Exhibits, #61 Reply to Response to Motion: UNSEALED documents (except for Dkt. #64 Attachment #6, per #72 Praecipe and per phone call from counsel. (PM)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 JUDGMENT BY COURT: This action is dismissed with prejudice and without an award of attorney fees. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(A). (PM)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's #44 Motion to dismiss and for discovery sanctions. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER. The Court ORDERS parties to meet and confer regarding sealing and redacting of Defendant's #61 reply brief within ten (10) days of the issuance of this order. Furthermore, Plaintiff is INSTRUCTED to file a response to Defendant's #60 motion to seal within fourteen (14) days of this order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Supplemental DECLARATION of Li Liu filed by Plaintiff Li Liu re #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Theriot-Orr, Devin)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER modifying deadlines provided in the Court's prior order (Dkt. No. #18 ). Motions in limine must be filed on or before Friday, March 23, 2018. Objections or responses to the motions in limine must be filed on or before Friday, March 30, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 SEALED ORDER for Supplemental Briefing. Plaintiff's supplemental briefing is due to the Court by March 2, 2018. The Clerk is DIRECTED to renote Defendant's motion to dismiss and motion for discovery sanctions (Dkt. No. #44 ) to March 2, 2018. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Counsel via e-mail)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Katrina Zafiro and Exhibits by Defendant Keegan Kell re #60 Second MOTION to Seal #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BECU June 2017 Statement, #2 Exhibit Higley Expenditures I, #3 Exhibit Higley Expenditures II, #4 Exhibit Liu Food Expenditures, #5 Exhibit UW Award Letter, #6 SEALED Exhibit 2017-18 FAFSA Application, #7 Exhibit Higley Paystub)(Jaeggli, Robert) Modified on 3/20/2018 to unseal all documents EXCEPT for Attachment #6 per #72 Praecipe, per #71 Response, per Minute Order #68 (PM).
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Fourth DECLARATION of Katrina Zafiro filed by Defendant Keegan Kell re #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Higley Statement, #3 Exhibit Email Response)(Jaeggli, Robert)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Third DECLARATION of Katrina Zafiro filed by Defendant Keegan Kell re #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Jaeggli, Robert)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SEALED DOCUMENT REPLY, filed by Defendant Keegan Kell, TO RESPONSE to #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Jaeggli, Robert) Modified on 3/7/2018 to administratively seal per the direction of chambers pending Defendant's motion to seal (See Dkt. No. #60 ) (TH). Modified on 3/20/2018 to unseal per #72 Praecipe, per #71 Response, per Order #68 . (PM).
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Second MOTION to Seal , filed by Defendant Keegan Kell. Noting Date 3/2/2018, (Jaeggli, Robert)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DECLARATION of Devin T. Theriot-Orr filed by Plaintiff Li Liu re #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Theriot-Orr, Devin)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 DECLARATION of Li Liu filed by Plaintiff Li Liu re #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Theriot-Orr, Devin)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Li Liu, to #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions. (Theriot-Orr, Devin)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #46 Stipulated Motion to Seal. The documents filed under seal (Dkt. Nos. 47-52) will remain sealed. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Second DECLARATION of Katrina Zafiro filed by Defendant Keegan Kell re #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Jaeggli, Robert)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 DECLARATION of Robert Jaeggli filed by Defendant Keegan Kell re #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Work Table)(Jaeggli, Robert)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 DECLARATION of Keegan Kell filed by Defendant Keegan Kell re #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Jaeggli, Robert)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SEALED DOCUMENT Public Benefits Table by Defendant Keegan Kell re #46 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Various Documents from Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Jaeggli, Robert)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SEALED DOCUMENT PayPal Deposits by Defendant Keegan Kell re #46 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Various Documents from Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Jaeggli, Robert)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SEALED DOCUMENT Higley Deposits by Defendant Keegan Kell re #46 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Various Documents from Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Jaeggli, Robert)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SEALED DOCUMENT Earnings Table by Defendant Keegan Kell re #46 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Various Documents from Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Jaeggli, Robert)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SEALED DOCUMENT ATM Deposits by Defendant Keegan Kell re #46 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Various Documents from Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Jaeggli, Robert)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SEALED DOCUMENT Sealed Exhibits to Docket No. 45 by Defendant Keegan Kell re #46 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Various Documents from Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #45 Declaration,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Credit Card Statement, #2 Exhibit Bank Statement, #3 Exhibit Credit Card Statements, #4 Exhibit Scottrade Statement)(Jaeggli, Robert)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Various Documents from Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Keegan Kell. Noting Date 2/2/2018, (Jaeggli, Robert)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DECLARATION of Katrina Zafiro, Appendix of Exhibits filed by Defendant Keegan Kell re #44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Excerpt, #2 Exhibit Property Detail, #3 Exhibit Deposition Excerpt, #4 Exhibit Deposition Excerpt, #5 Exhibit Deposition Excerpt, #6 Exhibit Motor Vehicle Lease Agreement, #7 Exhibit Deposition Excerpt, #8 Exhibit Deposition Excerpt, #9 Exhibit Deposition Excerpt, #10 Exhibit Deposition Excerpt, #11 Exhibit Marriage License Application, #12 Exhibit Marriage Certificate, #13 Exhibit Deposition Excerpt, #14 Exhibit Deposition Excerpt, #15 Exhibit Public Records Response, #16 Exhibit Deposition Excerpt, #17 Exhibit Deposition Excerpt, #18 Exhibit Demand Letter, #19 Exhibit Deposition Excerp, #20 Exhibit Rule 26(a) Disclosures, #21 Exhibit Interrogatories Answer, #22 Exhibit Proposed Settlement Agreement)(Jaeggli, Robert)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery Sanctions, filed by Defendant Keegan Kell. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 2/16/2018, (Jaeggli, Robert)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #37 Motion for Protective Order signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Second DECLARATION of Greg McLawsen filed by Plaintiff Li Liu re #37 MOTION for Protective Order (McLawsen, Gregory)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Li Liu, TO RESPONSE to #37 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McLawsen, Gregory)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RESPONSE, by Defendant Keegan Kell, to #37 MOTION for Protective Order . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katrina Zafiro, #2 Exhibit to Zafiro Declaration, #3 Declaration of Keegan Kell, #4 Kell Exhibit)(Jaeggli, Robert)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DECLARATION of Li Liu filed by Plaintiff Li Liu re #37 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Keegan Kell, #2 Exhibit 2 - Discovery requests)(McLawsen, Gregory)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DECLARATION of Greg McLawsen filed by Plaintiff Li Liu re #37 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Correspondence with opposing counsel)(McLawsen, Gregory)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff Li Liu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed order (red-lined), #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed order (clean)) Noting Date 1/12/2018, (McLawsen, Gregory)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Affirmative Defense of Equitable Estoppel ; filed by Defendant Keegan Kell. (Jaeggli, Robert)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #19 Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying Defendant's #22 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DECLARATION of Robert Jaeggli filed by Defendant Keegan Kell re #22 Cross MOTION Summary Judgment on Defense of Res Judicata (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Docket)(Jaeggli, Robert)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY, filed by Defendant Keegan Kell, TO RESPONSE to #22 Cross MOTION Summary Judgment on Defense of Res Judicata (Attachments: #1 Supplement Appendix CR 15)(Jaeggli, Robert)
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DECLARATION of Greg McLawsen filed by Plaintiff Li Liu re #22 Cross MOTION Summary Judgment on Defense of Res Judicata (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Theriot-Orr, Devin)
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DECLARATION of Devin T. Theriot-Orr filed by Plaintiff Li Liu re #22 Cross MOTION Summary Judgment on Defense of Res Judicata (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Theriot-Orr, Devin)
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Li Liu, to #22 Cross MOTION Summary Judgment on Defense of Res Judicata. Oral Argument Requested. (Theriot-Orr, Devin)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING Plaintiff's #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All of Defendant's Affirmative Defenses ; Noting Date 10/13/2017, authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Li Liu, TO RESPONSE to #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All of Defendant's Affirmative Defenses (Theriot-Orr, Devin)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECLARATION of Katrina S. Zafiro filed by Defendant Keegan Kell re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All of Defendant's Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Zafiro, Katrina)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION of Keegan Kell filed by Defendant Keegan Kell re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All of Defendant's Affirmative Defenses (Zafiro, Katrina)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE, by Defendant Keegan Kell, to #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All of Defendant's Affirmative Defenses. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Zafiro, Katrina)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECLARATION of Keegan Kell filed by Defendant Keegan Kell re #22 Cross MOTION Summary Judgment on Defense of Res Judicata (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Zafiro, Katrina)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECLARATION of Robert L. Jaeggli filed by Defendant Keegan Kell re #22 Cross MOTION Summary Judgment on Defense of Res Judicata (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Zafiro, Katrina)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Cross MOTION Summary Judgment on Defense of Res Judicata, filed by Defendant Keegan Kell. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Citation, #2 Citation, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/13/2017, (Zafiro, Katrina)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION of Devin T. Theriot-Orr filed by Plaintiff Li Liu re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All of Defendant's Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Theriot-Orr, Devin)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION of Li Liu filed by Plaintiff Li Liu re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All of Defendant's Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Theriot-Orr, Devin)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All of Defendant's Affirmative Defenses, filed by Plaintiff Li Liu. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/22/2017, (Theriot-Orr, Devin)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER per Defendant's #17 Jury Demand, the Court changes the following: JURY Trial is set for 4/23/2018 at 09:30 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour; Amended Pleadings due by 10/20/2017, ADR deadline is 2/23/2018; Discovery completed 120 days before trial, Dispositive motions due 90 days before trial; Proposed pretrial order due by 4/10/2018, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 4/13/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Keegan Kell (Zafiro, Katrina)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #15 Motion for leave to file a late jury demand. Defendant shall file a jury demand within seven days of this order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION File Late Jury Demand , filed by Defendant Keegan Kell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Counsel) Noting Date 8/18/2017, (Jaeggli, Robert)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE held before United States District Judge John C. Coughenour; Courtroom Deputy Clerk Paul Pierson; Court Reporter Nancy Bauer; Plaintiff(s) Counsel Greg McLawsen; Defendant(s) Counsel Robert Jaeggli. The case was called and counsel made their appearance. The Court inquires of counsel concerning their desired trial date and time estimate for trial. Note that all depositions, discovery and perpetuation, must be completed before the discovery completion date. Counsel are advised that this case is one of several cases set for the week described below. Counsel shall be prepared to commence trial as scheduled, but understand that the trial may have to be continued. Counsel are directed to contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at paul_pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov 2-4 weeks in advance of the trial date regarding the Court`s trial calendar. Case management dates are established as follows: 4-DAY ESTIMATE for a COURT TRIAL set on 4/23/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour; Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 4/13/2018; Pleading amendment/3rd pty action is/are due by 10/20/2017; 39.1 mediation shall be completed by 2/23/2018; Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/16/2018; Discovery cutoff is 120 days before trial; and, the dispositive motion filing deadline is 90 days before trial.Counsel shall attend Courtroom Technology Training at least 1 month in advance of the trial date in order to become familiar utilizing the new A/V equipment now available in the courtroom. Training is held at 3:00 p.m. on the 1st and 3rd Wednesday of each month in Courtroom 18B. (PP)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION by parties (Theriot-Orr, Devin)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katrina Zafiro on behalf of Defendant Keegan Kell. (Zafiro, Katrina)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint Amended by Agreement of the Parties by Keegan Kell.(Jaeggli, Robert)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Attorney Katrina Zafiro for Keegan Kell added; per #9 Answer to Complaint. (RS)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert L Jaeggli on behalf of Defendant Keegan Kell. (Jaeggli, Robert)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint Attorney Robert L Jaeggli added to party Keegan Kell(pty:dft) by Keegan Kell.(Jaeggli, Robert)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Devin T Theriot-Orr on behalf of Plaintiff Li Liu. (Theriot-Orr, Devin)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Keegan Kell mailed on 4/26/2017 (McLawsen, Gregory)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hon. James P. Donohue.(RS)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 8/1/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED to Judge James P. Donohue: re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (RE)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ; filed by Plaintiff Li Liu. (McLawsen, Gregory)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER: CIVIL COVER SHEET MISSING:Please post the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Civil Cover Sheet found in Other Documents and relate back to the Complaint. Thank you (RE)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER: COMPLAINT POSTED WITH IFP AS A SEPARATE DOCKET ENTRY: Please note that when filing a case IFP you must post the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis as your initiating document. As attachments to that IFP you will post your Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and any Summonses you wish issued. You will find it helpful to use the Attorney Case Opening Instructions found on the court's website under the Attorneys tab/Civil Case Opening/Attorneys Guide to Opening a Civil Case. Call the Attorney Case Opening Helpdesk at 206-370-8787 with any additional questions. Thank you. (RE)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (RE)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Keegan Kell, filed by Li Liu.(McLawsen, Gregory)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Li Liu.(McLawsen, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. Kell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Li Liu
Represented By: Devin T Theriot-Orr
Represented By: Gregory Hortman McLawsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keegan Kell
Represented By: Katrina Zafiro
Represented By: Robert L Jaeggli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?