Steele et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Steele and Stephanie A. Steele
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington
Case Number: 2:2017cv00643
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER dismissing action without prejudice by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by 9/15/2017 why this action should not be dismissed for failing to comply with the Order requiring Joint Status Report. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Stipulated Motion for withdrawal and substitution of counsel. Attorney Barbara L Bollero withdrawing and Attorneys Rudy Albert Englund, David C Spellman, and Jane E. Brown substituting for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Second Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to 6/15/17 to Answer by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant Wells Fargo Banks 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; the deadline for defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to file and serve a responsive pleading or motion is EXTENDED to May 22, 2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Steele
Represented By: Ajibola O Oladapo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie A. Steele
Represented By: Ajibola O Oladapo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Barbara L Bollero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington
Represented By: Robert W McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?