Beard et al v. Ecolab, Inc
Plaintiff: Earl Beard and Alexis Lopez
Defendant: Ecolab, Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv00663
Filed: April 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re parties' 31 Joint Stipulated Motion to Approve Settlement and Dismiss Case; This action is dismissed with prejudice, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Settlement of Attorneys' Fees re parties' 29 Stipulation signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER dismissing Mr. Beard's and Mr. Lopez's claims with prejudice per 23 Offer of Judgment and 24 Acceptance of Offer of Judgment. Plaintiffs Craig Baham and Robert Van Horn's claims against Ecolab remain. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Stipulated Motion to extend the Joint Status Report deadline. Joint Status Report due by 7/28/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLASS/COLLECTIVE CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge James L. Robart. Deadline to complete discovery on class/collective certification: 09/27/2017; Deadline for Plaintiffs to file motion for class/collective certification: 10/27/2017. (AD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?