Bowen et al v. CSO Financial Inc et al
Plaintiff: Duane Bowen, Amanda Maier, Kathleen Muller and Luis A Ortiz
Defendant: CSO Financial Inc, J. Michael Unfred, Mary Inscore and John Does One Through Ten
Case Number: 2:2017cv00677
Filed: May 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for final approval of the class action settlement (Dkt. No. 34 ), unopposed motion for attorney fees and statutory damage and service awards (Dkt. No. 28 ), and the parties' stipulation and proposed o rder for injunction (Dkt. No. 34 -2). The Court hereby grants Class Counsel's request for an award of reasonable attorneys' fees and litigation costs. This Action is hereby dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Except as otherwise pro vided in this Final Approval Order and Judgment, the parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation (Dkt. No. 34 -2), the Court further ORDERS that Defendant CSO shall permanently cease any effort to collect Check Fees from any member of the CPA Sub-Class as defined in the Settlement Agreement approved by this Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re Plaintiff's 23 Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. The Court finds that (a) the Agreement resulted from extensive arm's-length negotiations, with participation of an experienced mediator, and (b) the Agreement is sufficient to warrant notice thereof to members of the Plaintiff Class and the Final Approval Hearing. The Final Approval Hearing is scheduled for July 10, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 19 Stipulation Extending Deadline for Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. The motion for class certification must be filed by 2/16/2018. The opposition brief must be filed by 4/6/2018. The reply brief must be filed by 4/20/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 16 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re parties 13 agreement regarding discovery of electronically stored information (ESI). Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 12 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Class Certification; The motion for class certification must be filed by 12/15/2017. Defendants' opposition brief must be filed by 2/2/2018. Plaintiffs' reply brief must be filed by 2/16/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen et al v. CSO Financial Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Bowen
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Adams
Represented By: Paul Arons
Represented By: Blythe H Chandler
Represented By: Samuel R Leonard
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Maier
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Adams
Represented By: Paul Arons
Represented By: Blythe H Chandler
Represented By: Samuel R Leonard
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Muller
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Adams
Represented By: Paul Arons
Represented By: Blythe H Chandler
Represented By: Samuel R Leonard
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis A Ortiz
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Adams
Represented By: Paul Arons
Represented By: Blythe H Chandler
Represented By: Samuel R Leonard
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSO Financial Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey I Hasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Michael Unfred
Represented By: Suzanne K Pierce
Represented By: Patrick N Rothwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Inscore
Represented By: Jeffrey I Hasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does One Through Ten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?