Jones v. Slade et al
Plaintiff: Carol Jones
Defendant: Todd Slade, Eric Olsen and The City of Kirkland
Case Number: 2:2017cv00680
Filed: May 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal re parties' 31 Stipulation; Plaintiff's claims against Defendants are dismissed with prejudice and without assessment by the Court of costs or attorneys' fees to either party, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Plaintiff's unopposed 23 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying the parties' 10 stipulated motion for protective order without prejudice to re-filing in a manner that comports with the court's local rules. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER extending the following deadlines: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/21/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/4/2017, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan as Required by FRCP 26 (f) and Local Civil Rule 26(f): due by 8/11/2017. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Slade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Jones
Represented By: Kirk C Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Slade
Represented By: Jeremy W Culumber
Represented By: Kevin M. Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Olsen
Represented By: Jeremy W Culumber
Represented By: Kevin M. Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Kirkland
Represented By: Jeremy W Culumber
Represented By: Kevin M. Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?