Brandt v. Columbia Credit Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Russell Brandt
Defendant: Columbia Credit Services, Inc., Wales & Woehler, Inc., P.S., Jason L. Woehler and Sacor Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00703
Filed: May 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 55 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RE: STATUTORY DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. The Court, in its discretion, awards $1,000 under the FDCPA and trebles Mr. Brandt's damages under the CPA, awarding $25,000. Wales & Woehler, Inc., and Jason Woehler must pay these awards in addition to the jury award in this case. Wales & Woehler, Inc., P.S., and Jason Woehler are enjoined from ever again contacting Plaintiff Russell Brandt for any reason whatsoever. (PM)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER STAYING CASE pending the outcome of Plaintiff's forthcoming Motion for Relief from Stay in In re Woehler, Case No. 18-12299-CMA. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: Jason Woehler via ECF ad hoc
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE no later than noon on Wednesday, 6/13/2018, why this instant action should not be stayed as a result of the filing of Defendant Whoehler's bankruptcy, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting in part and deferring in part Plaintiff's 30 Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Summary Judgment against Defendants Wales & Woehler, Inc., P.S. and Jason Woehler as to liability under the CPA and FDCPA. Plaintiff may proceed to trial on the issue of damages. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 21 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Party Sacor Financial, Inc.. It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's individual claims against defendant Sacor should be and hereby are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and without costs or attorney fees to any party. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Stipulated Motion to extend the noting date on Sacor's 14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration from 9/29/2017 to 10/27/2017; Response due 10/23/2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandt v. Columbia Credit Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Brandt
Represented By: SaraEllen M Hutchison
Represented By: Samuel R Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Credit Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wales & Woehler, Inc., P.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason L. Woehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacor Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine A Christofilis
Represented By: Jeffrey I Hasson
Represented By: Daniel L Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?