Allied World Surplus Lines et al
Plaintiff: Allied World Surplus Lines and Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Premera
Case Number: 2:2017cv00714
Filed: May 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER for Stay re parties' 92 Joint Motion; STRIKING Court's 82 Amended Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal of Claims between Allied World and Premera with prejudice re parties' 90 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting parties' 88 Second Joint Motion to Amend Order Setting Trial Date: Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/6/2019, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 78 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 LETTER FROM COURT re parties' 76 Stipulation for Protective Order, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Court is declining to sign. (SWT)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re parties' 55 Stipulation Extending Time for Counterclaim Defendant Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company to Respond to Defendant Premera's Counterclaim; deadline for Counterclaim Defendant Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company to answer, move or otherwise respond to Premera's Counterclaim is extended to November 15, 2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 38 Stipulation ; the deadline for Counterclaim Defendants to respond to Premera's Counterclaim is extended to 11/15/2017, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez for Judge Robert S Lasnik. (SWT)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME 32 , by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Lexington may have until Monday, October 16, 2017 to answer, move or otherwise respond to Premera's counterclaim (KERR)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER VACATING 23 Order to Show Cause ; granting Defendant's 21 Motion to Amend its Answer and Counterclaim to Join Necessary Parties, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within five days of the date of this Order why defendant should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with Local Rule 10(e)(9), by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied World Surplus Lines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied World Surplus Lines
Represented By: Bryan C Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan C Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premera
Represented By: John R Neeleman
Represented By: Gwendolyn C. Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?