Christopher v. Ford Motor Company Inc et al
Plaintiff: Carrea Christopher
Defendant: Ford Motor Company Inc, Clay Ford, Mark Fields, Kerry Baldori, Don Butler, Stephen G Butler and Raphael Richmond
Case Number: 2:2017cv00738
Filed: May 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying 86 Motion for Order to Stop Harrasment. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER Renoting Plaintiff's 93 MOTION to Dismiss: Noting Date 9/13/2019. Authorized by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING 84 MOTION to Compel ; Noting Date 5/17/2019 (KERR)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying as moot plaintiff's 73 Application for Extension of Time to Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER that trial be set for February 3, 2020 re plaintiff's 68 Application for Case Scheduling and Trial Date. The Clerk of Court will issue an appropriate Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 45 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING plaintiff's 73 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to Motion to Compel Discovery: Noting Date 1/25/2019. Authorized by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 67 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting parties' 63 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying plaintiff's 50 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting plaintiff's 33 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court will consider the proposed amended complaint (dkt. 34 ) as timely. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting defendants' 13 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing the complaint with prejudice. The Court grants plaintiff leave to amend complaint within 45 days. Given the Court's determination on defendants' motion to dismiss, plaintiff's pending motions for extensions of time, Dkt. ## 16 , 20 , 23 , and defendants' motion for a discovery stay, Dkt. # 12 , are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 7 Application for Extension of Time toServe and Request for Court Order to Have United States Marshal to Serve, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher v. Ford Motor Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrea Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Baldori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen G Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raphael Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?