Premier Harvest et al v. AXIS Surplus Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Premier Harvest LLC and Premier Harvest Adak LLC
Defendant: AXIS Surplus Insurance Company and Cunningham Lindsey U.S. Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv00784
Filed: May 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 132 Stipulation and Order for Dismissal. This stipulation is self-executing, and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 130 Notice of Settlement; VACATING trial date; terminating Defendant AXIS Surplus Insurance Company's 120 Motion to Compel and 107 Motion for Sanctions, Defendant Cunningham Lindsey US's 126 Motion for Summary Judgment and 104 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; directing parties to file appropriate dismissal paperwork for a Joint Status Report by 11/8/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SWT)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MINUTE ORDER renoting Plaintiffs' 104 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment for Friday, October 12, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 98 Stipulated Motion FOR RELIEF FROM SCHEDULING ORDER AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM. AXIS may file its amended answer, as proposed (Dkt. No. 99 -1 at 231) within seven (7) days of this order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 74 Motion to Compel signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting parties' 93 Stipulated Motion for Issuance of Letter Rogatory to Court of British Columbia, Canada for Discovery from Non-Parties Robert Reierson and Tradex Food. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Axis Surplus Insurance Company's 70 Motion to Compel Non-Party Golden Harvest Alaska Seafood LLC to Comply with Subpoena. Golden Harvest is ORDERED to provide responsive documents pursuant to the subpoena, as narrowed, no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 71 Motion to Compel David L. Anderson, dba D.L. Anderson, Inc. to Comply with Subpoena Duces Tecum . Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER directing Defendant Axis Surplus Insurance Company to provide the Court with documents for in camera review by 3/28/2018; RENOTING Plaintiff's 74 MOTION to Compel : Noting Date 3/28/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 67 Stipulated Motion granting extension of time to phase discovery, extend discovery cutoff and continue trial date. The trial date is reset to January 14, 2019. The revised dispositive motion cut off is 90 days prior to this date and the revised discovery cutoff is 120 days prior to this date. Motions related to document discovery shall be filed on or before March 1, 2018. Expert reports are due June 15, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court pursuant to its discovery order awarding attorney fees to Plaintiff. (See Dkt. No. 58 at 45.) The Court has since received declarations from Plaintiffs' counsel, Isaac Ruiz (Dkt. Nos. 62 , 64 , 65 ) . The declarations adequately support the amount of time spent responding to Defendants' motion to quash (Dkt. No. 52 ). Further, the attorney's rates are reasonable. Therefore, the Court awards Plaintiff $7,977.50 in attorney fees. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's fee declaration (Dkt. No. 62 .) Plaintiff is DIRECTED to itemize the time spent by the individuals included in Plaintiff's fee declaration between the following activities: (a) preparation of subpoenas, (b) meet-and-confer process, (c) preparation of response to motion to quash, (d) preparation of fee declaration, and (e) other activities. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying Defendants' 59 Motion for Reconsideration. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING Defendant's 52 Motion to Quash and GRANTING Plaintiff's request for attorney fees (Dkt. No. 54 at 12). Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(TH)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 39 Motion to Compel signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying Defendant Axis' 33 Motion for Protective Order; denying Defendant Axis' 13 Motion to Dismiss, signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(SWT)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER directing parties to file supplemental briefing addressing choice of law. Briefs should be limited to five pages and must be filed no later than September 29, 2017. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to renote Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 13 ) to September 30, 2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 26 Motion to file supplemental information. The Court will rule on Defendant's motion to dismiss, however, not until after the scheduled date of the examinations, August 29 and 30, 2017. The Clerk is directed to RENOTE Defendant AXIS Surplus Insurance Company's 13 MOTION to Dismiss for 8/15/2017. Parties to submit a status update after 8/30/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER directing the Defendant to provide the Court with a status update within 5 days of this Order re: 13 motion to dismiss. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Premier Harvest et al v. AXIS Surplus Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Harvest LLC
Represented By: Gregory D Pendleton
Represented By: Isaac Ruiz
Represented By: William Candler Smart
Represented By: Jeffrey I Tilden
Represented By: Gregory D Pendleton
Represented By: Isaac Ruiz
Represented By: William Candler Smart
Represented By: Jeffrey I Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Harvest Adak LLC
Represented By: Gregory D Pendleton
Represented By: Isaac Ruiz
Represented By: William Candler Smart
Represented By: Jeffrey I Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXIS Surplus Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig Hinton Bennion
Represented By: Thomas Martin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cunningham Lindsey U.S. Inc
Represented By: Vasudev Narasimha Addanki
Represented By: Kathryn Naegeli Boling
Represented By: Joseph D Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?