Spears v Brown et al
Plaintiff: Triston Spears
Defendant: Roger Brown, Beau Owens, Daniel Perreira, Anthony Spivey, Michael Manz, Scott D'Amato, King County and John Doe Number One
Case Number: 2:2017cv00787
Filed: May 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED without prejudice, signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER vacating the status conference currently scheduled for October 24, 2017. The Court will reschedule the status conference if Plaintiff files proof of service within the previously ordered deadline. (See Dkt. No. 13 .) Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying Defendants' 8 Motion to Dismiss. Pursuant to Rule 4(m), Spears is ORDERED to perfect service on Defendants within 30 days of the issuance of this order. If Spears fails to serve Defendants within 30 days of the issuance of this order, Defendants may renew their motion to dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; RESETTING Status Conference for 10/24/2017 at 09:00. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)(Attorney Jay H Krulewitch terminated) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears v Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triston Spears
Represented By: Jay H Krulewitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Brown
Represented By: Daniel L Kinerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beau Owens
Represented By: Daniel L Kinerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Perreira
Represented By: Daniel L Kinerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Spivey
Represented By: Daniel L Kinerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Manz
Represented By: Daniel L Kinerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D'Amato
Represented By: Daniel L Kinerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: Daniel L Kinerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Number One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?