Barton, Jr v. Lake Whatcom Residential and Treatment Center

Plaintiff: Herman Lee Barton, Jr
Defendant: Lake Whatcom Residential and Treatment Center
Case Number: 2:2017cv00861
Filed: June 14, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing plaintiff to show cause within 30 days by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS) cc plaintiff
August 14, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 8 Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
August 10, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Herman Lee Barton, Jr is referred to Magistrate Judge Mary Alice Theiler to issue an amended Report and Recommendation; clerk directed to remove 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis from the motions calendar by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS) cc plaintiff
July 10, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re plaintiff's 4 Revised MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ; Plaintiff is directed to submit a revised and completed amended IFP application within twenty (20) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff with IFP application)
June 28, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ; Plaintiff is directed to submit a revised and completed IFP application within twenty (20) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff with IFP application)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barton, Jr v. Lake Whatcom Residential and Treatment Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Lee Barton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Whatcom Residential and Treatment Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?